EP0445108 - A METHOD FOR TREATING GAMMAGLOBULIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.09.1993 [1993/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RUBINSTEIN, Alan I. 100 S. Doheney Drive, No. 301 Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states RUBINSTEIN, Alan I. 100 S. Doheney Drive Number 301 Los Angeles, CA 90048 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87901863.8 | 06.02.1987 | [1991/37] | WO1987US00289 | Priority number, date | US19860838254 | 10.03.1986 Original published format: US 838254 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705220 | Date: | 11.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0445108 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.09.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.09.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/29 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
A61L2/0023 (EP);
A61K39/395 (EP);
A61L2/04 (EP);
C07K16/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/37] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON GAMMAGLOBULIN | [1991/37] | English: | A METHOD FOR TREATING GAMMAGLOBULIN | [1991/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT DE GAMMAGLOBULINE | [1991/37] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 03.10.1988 | National basic fee paid | 03.10.1988 | Search fee paid | 03.10.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 12.09.1988 | Examination requested [1991/37] | 29.05.1989 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 02.08.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 13.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/39] | 26.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1993 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]JP62283933 ; | [E]EP0270516 | [E] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 108, 1988, page 329, abstract no. 226822e, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-62 283 933 (GREEN CROSS CORP.) 09-12-1987, & JP62283933 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]US3903262 ; | [Y]US3984539 ; | [Y]US4082734 ; | [Y]US4168303 ; | [Y]US4327086 ; | [Y]US4440679 | [Y] - The Lancet, 19 November 1983 (WELCH). | [Y] - The New England Journal of Medicine, 314 (PRINCE), 06 February 1986, pages 386-387. | [X] - Vox Sang. 51: 239-243, (1986), (TERSMETTE). |