EP0261200 - VASCULAR PROSTHESES APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.08.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED VASCULAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 1100 Hercules, Suite 220 Houston, TX 77058 / US | [1988/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEINBERG, Steven, L. 916 Davis Road League City, TX 77573 / US | 02 /
SNYDER, Roger, W. 2716 Bent Tree Trail League City, TX 77573 / US | 03 /
LALOR, Gabriel, P. 18112 Starboard Drive Houston, TX 77058 / US | [1988/13] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/13] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87902220.0 | 10.03.1987 | [1988/13] | WO1987US00475 | Priority number, date | US19860844961 | 27.03.1986 Original published format: US 844961 | [1988/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705796 | Date: | 08.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0261200 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06, A61L27/00 | [1988/13] | CPC: |
A61F2/06 (EP);
A61L27/34 (EP);
C08L23/12 (EP);
C08L67/00 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61L27/34, C08L23/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/13] | Title | German: | GEFÄSSPROTHESEN UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [1988/13] | English: | VASCULAR PROSTHESES APPARATUS AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURE | [1988/13] | French: | PROTHESES VASCULAIRES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [1988/13] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 16.11.1987 | National basic fee paid | 16.11.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.11.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.11.1987 | Examination requested [1988/13] | 13.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/38] | 24.04.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | GB962569 [ ] (THURINGISCHES KUNSTFASERWERK W); | US3304557 [ ] (SEYMOUR POLANSKY); | GB1183497 [ ] (ETHICON INC [US]); | FR2333487 [ ] (RHONE POULENC IND [FR]) |