EP0263157 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING SIGNALS BETWEEN MODULES OF AN ELECTRONIC UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.1993 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.03.1993 [1993/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMTECH société anonyme Route de Lourmarin F-84160 Cadenet / FR | [1992/08] |
Former [1988/15] | For all designated states LELLOUCHE, Isaac M. 2, rue Hegesippe Moreau F-75018 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/15] | Representative(s) | Sauvage, Renée Cabinet Sauvage 17, rue du Colonel Oudot 75012 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/15] | Sauvage, Renée Cabinet Sauvage 100 bis, avenue de Saint-Mandé F-75012 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87902552.6 | 22.04.1987 | [1988/15] | WO1987FR00132 | Priority number, date | FR19860005759 | 22.04.1986 Original published format: FR 8605759 | [1988/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706740 | Date: | 05.11.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0263157 | Date: | 13.04.1988 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0263157 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40, H04M9/02 | [1988/15] | CPC: |
G06F13/4022 (EP,US);
H04M9/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1988/15] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SIGNALÜBERTRAGUNG ZWISCHEN MODULEN EINER ELEKTRONISCHEN ANORDNUNG | [1988/15] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR TRANSFERRING SIGNALS BETWEEN MODULES OF AN ELECTRONIC UNIT | [1988/15] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE TRANSFERT DE SIGNAUX ENTRE DES MODULES D'UN ENSEMBLE ELECTRONIQUE | [1988/15] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 08.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 13.11.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | For: | BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE | Licencee: | S.A.R.L. SOREME 16, rue Gabriel Péri 92120 Montrouge / FR | Date: | 06.02.1992 |
Former [1992/13] | ID: | 01 00/not-exclusive | |
For: | all designated states | ||
Licencee: | S.A.R.L. SOREME 16, rue Gabriel Péri 92120 Montrouge / FR | ||
Date: | Cited in | International search | JP5858631 [ ]; | JP60229562 [ ]; | US4292475 [ ] (HILL STEPHEN R, et al) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 7, No. 146 (P-206)(1291) 25 Juin 1983, voir Resume & JP, A, 5858631 (Nippon Denki K.K.) 7 Avril 1983, & JP5858631 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 10, No. 87 (E-393) (2144), 5 Avril 1986, voir Resume & JP, A, 60229562 (Nippon Denshin Denwa Kosha) 14 Novembre 1985, & JP60229562 A 00000000 | Examination | - Elektrotechnik, 63, H. 17, 11. September 1981, pages 30 à33, "Rationalisiert die Messwerterfassung", Ing. Werner Soemer |