EP0307400 - INHIBITORS OF ESTERASE-PRODUCING MICRO-ORGANISMS, FOR USE PRIMARILY IN DEODORANT COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/12] | INHIBITORS OF ESTERASE-PRODUCING MICRO-ORGANISMS, FOR USE PRIMARILY IN DERMATOLOGY AND COSMETICS | ||
[1992/15] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.04.1999 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERTET S.A. 37, avenue Sidi-Brahim 06130 Grasse / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | For all designated states ROBERTET S.A. 37, avenue Sidi-Brahim F-06130 Grasse / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BETTS, John, Adrian Valhalla New Road Haslemere Surrey GU27 3RW / GB | [1989/12] | Representative(s) | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Wilson Gunn Gee Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/12] | Dixon, Donald Cossar, et al Gee & Co. Chancery House Chancery Lane London WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 87902669.8 | 12.05.1987 | [1989/12] | WO1987GB00323 | Priority number, date | GB19860011650 | 13.05.1986 Original published format: GB 8611650 | [1989/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706827 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0307400 | Date: | 22.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0307400 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/32, A61K31/235 | [1989/12] | CPC: |
A61Q15/00 (EP);
A61K8/37 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P31/04 (EP);
A61Q19/00 (EP);
A61Q5/006 (EP);
A61K2800/782 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/18] |
Former [1989/12] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | INHIBITOREN VON ESTERASE PRODUZIERENDEN MIKROORGANISMEN ZUR HAUPTVERWENDUNG IN DEODORANTS | [1992/15] | English: | INHIBITORS OF ESTERASE-PRODUCING MICRO-ORGANISMS, FOR USE PRIMARILY IN DEODORANT COMPOSITIONS | [1992/15] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE MICRO-ORGANISMES PRODUCTEURS D'ESTERASE, DESTINES A ETRE UTILISES PRINCIPALEMENT DANS LES DEODORANTS | [1992/15] |
Former [1989/12] | INHIBITOREN VON ESTERASE PRODUZIERENDEN MIKROORGANISMEN ZUR HAUPTVERWENDUNG IN DERMATOLOGIE UND IN DER KOSMETIK | ||
Former [1989/12] | INHIBITORS OF ESTERASE-PRODUCING MICRO-ORGANISMS, FOR USE PRIMARILY IN DERMATOLOGY AND COSMETICS | ||
Former [1989/12] | INHIBITEURS DE MICRO-ORGANISMES PRODUCTEURS D'ESTERASE, DESTINES A ETRE UTILISES PRINCIPALEMENT EN DERMATOLOGIE ET DANS LES PRODUITS DE BEAUTE | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.1988 | National basic fee paid | 29.11.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 11.11.1988 | Examination requested [1989/12] | 20.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.10.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.12.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
06.01.1993
11.02.1993
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 / Unilever Hse, 100 Victoria Embankment, Blackfriars 3013 AL Rotterdam / London EC4Y 0DY / NL Opponent's representative Matthews, Heather Clare Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.01.1993
11.02.1993
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. Weena 455 3013 AL Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Matthews, Heather Clare Nash Matthews 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [1998/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.01.1993
11.02.1993
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Matthews, Heather Clare Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | ||
Former [1993/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
06.01.1993
11.02.1993
ADMISSIBLE Unilever N.V. P.O. Box 760 3000 DK Rotterdam / NL Opponent's representative Dekker, Enno E.J. Unilever N.V. Patents Division P.O. Box 137 NL-3130 AC Vlaardingen / NL | 16.02.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 20.08.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 13.09.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.10.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 19.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 23.04.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/24] | Appeal following opposition | 24.11.1994 | Appeal received No. T0892/94 | 03.02.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 11.03.1998 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [1998/11] | 08.07.1998 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1998/28] | 19.01.1999 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 19.01.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.1999 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0039857 [ ] (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | US3808319 [ ] (KANFOUSH J); | BE458964 [ ]; | DE2617817 [ ] (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | FR2374039 [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | FR2374292 [ ] (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | FR2390160 [ ] (HENKEL KGAA [DE]); | EP0054174 [ ] (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) |