EP0268605 - CONTAINER FOR STORING FOOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.04.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LEGION INTERNATIONAL Postfach 484 FL-9490 Vaduz / LI | [1988/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENTINCK VAN SCHOONHETEN, Steven, Carl 20 The Vale London SW3 / GB | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Allen, Oliver John Richard, et al Norman House, 105-109 Strand London, WC2R OAE / GB | [1988/22] | Application number, filing date | 87902673.0 | 13.05.1987 | [1988/22] | WO1987GB00330 | Priority number, date | GB19860011688 | 13.05.1986 Original published format: GB 8611688 | [1988/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706922 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268605 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, B65D88/62 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
B65D77/06 (EP);
B65D88/62 (EP);
B67D1/0462 (EP);
B65D2205/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/22] | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSBEHÄLTER | [1988/22] | English: | CONTAINER FOR STORING FOOD | [1988/22] | French: | CONTENEUR POUR STOCKER DES PRODUITS ALIMENTAIRES | [1988/22] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 05.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1990/24] | 17.01.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1990/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1223844 [ ]; | FR1427992 [ ] |