EP0268683 - METHOD OF RECONSTITUTING INSTRUCTION POSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC LTD 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states FANUC LTD. 3580, Shibokusa Aza-Komanba, Oshinomura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-05 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IWAGAYA, Takashi Fanuc Hino-shataku 205 3-27, Tamadaira Hino-shi Tokyo 191 / JP | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Billington, Lawrence Emlyn, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87902739.9 | 21.04.1987 | [1988/22] | WO1987JP00250 | Priority number, date | JP19860091844 | 21.04.1986 Original published format: JP 9184486 | [1988/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706729 | Date: | 05.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268683 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268683 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 05.11.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/403 | [1988/22] | CPC: |
G05B19/232 (EP,US);
G05B2219/41422 (EP,US);
G05B2219/50084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKBILDUNG EINER BEFEHLSSTELLUNG | [1988/22] | English: | METHOD OF RECONSTITUTING INSTRUCTION POSITION | [1988/22] | French: | PROCEDE DE RECONSTITUTION D'UNE POSITION D'INSTRUCTION | [1988/22] | Entry into regional phase | 17.12.1987 | Translation filed | 06.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 06.01.1988 | Search fee paid | 06.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 19.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 31.03.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1994/24] | FR | 20.08.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4045660 (WEISGERBER WILLIAM ROBERT, et al) | International search | [A]JPS493086 ; | [A]JPS5451079 (TOKYO SHIBAURA ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS58127208 (AMADA CO LTD) | Examination | JPS494086 |