EP0268686 - DEVICE FOR SELECTING STARTING SPEED STAGE IN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | For all designated states KABUSHIKI KAISHA KOMATSU SEISAKUSHO 3-6, Akasaka 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KANEKO, Kiyoshi 2608-1, Nogawa Miyamae-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken 213 / JP | 02 /
KATO, Yoshiaki 3-8-7, Miyoshi-cho Fuchu-shi Tokyo 183 / JP | [1988/22] | Representative(s) | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Southgate Whitefriars Lewins Mead Bristol BS1 2NT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/22] | Newstead, Michael John, et al Page Hargrave Temple Gate House Temple Gate Bristol BS1 6PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87902765.4 | 07.05.1987 | [1988/22] | WO1987JP00281 | Priority number, date | JP19860105146 | 08.05.1986 Original published format: JP 10514686 | [1988/22] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706988 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0268686 | Date: | 01.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0268686 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/02, B60K41/04 | [1990/34] | CPC: |
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
B60W2552/15 (EP,US);
F16H2059/663 (EP,US);
F16H2061/023 (EP,US);
F16H2312/02 (EP,US);
F16H59/10 (EP,US);
F16H59/40 (EP,US);
F16H59/52 (EP,US);
F16H59/66 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1988/22] | F16H5/40, B60K41/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1988/22] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR WAHL DES GANGBEREICHS ZUM ANFAHREN BEI AUTOMATIKGETRIEBEN | [1988/22] | English: | DEVICE FOR SELECTING STARTING SPEED STAGE IN AUTOMATIC TRANSMISSION | [1988/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE SELECTIONNER UNE PLAGE DE VITESSE DE DEMARRAGE DANS UNE TRANSMISSION AUTOMATIQUE | [1988/22] | Entry into regional phase | 07.01.1988 | Translation filed | 25.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.1988 | Search fee paid | 25.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/22] | 21.02.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.10.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3876028 (ASANO TADAO, et al); | [Y]WO8602112 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [Y]DE3334719 (WABCO WESTINGHOUSE FAHRZEUG [DE]); | [A]US4518068 (OGUMA TOMIO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0006033 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP]) | International search | [Y]JPH05241426B ; | [Y]JPH05241425B ; | [Y]JPS60131430U ; | [Y]JPH05149087B |