EP0273056 - RADIAL TIRE AND ASSEMBLY OF RADIAL TIRE AND RIM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 1-1, Tsutsui-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/27] | For all designated states SUMITOMO RUBBER INDUSTRIES LIMITED No. 1-1, Tsutsui-cho 1-chome Chuo-ku Kobe-shi Hyogo 651 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOMA, Hiroyuki 16-3, Suzurandai Kitamachi 3-chome Kita-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 651-11 / JP | 02 /
SAITOU, Saneto Room 514, Port-Island Danchi 54 3-1, Minatojima Nakamachi 3-chome Chuo-ku, Kobe-shi Hyogo 650 / JP | [1988/27] | Representative(s) | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey, et al SP TYRES UK LIMITED Technical Division Fort Dunlop, Erdington Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey, et al SP TYRES UK LIMITED Technical Division Fort Dunlop, Erdington, Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | ||
Former [1988/27] | Stewart, Charles Geoffrey SP TYRES UK LIMITED Tyre Technical Division Fort Dunlop Birmingham B24 9QT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87902780.3 | 11.05.1987 | [1988/27] | WO1987JP00298 | Priority number, date | JP19860113200 | 16.05.1986 Original published format: JP 11320086 | [1988/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706891 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0273056 | Date: | 06.07.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0273056 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.11.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60C9/08, B60C9/18, B60C15/02, B60C15/06, B60C17/08 | [1988/27] | CPC: |
B60C15/0226 (EP,US);
B60C11/00 (EP,US);
B60C15/00 (EP,US);
B60C17/08 (EP,US);
Y10S152/03 (EP,US);
Y10S152/17 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/27] | Title | German: | RADIALREIFEN SOWIE FELGEN- UND RADIALREIFENEINHEIT | [1988/27] | English: | RADIAL TIRE AND ASSEMBLY OF RADIAL TIRE AND RIM | [1988/27] | French: | PNEUMATIQUE RADIAL ET ENSEMBLE PNEUMATIQUE RADIAL ET JANTE | [1988/27] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1988 | Translation filed | 12.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1988 | Search fee paid | 12.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 14.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.05.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2117330 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD); | [X]EP0008511 (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3314563 (BRIDGESTONE TIRE CO LTD [JP]) | International search | JPH04992705 [ ]; | JPH04992704 [ ]; | JPH05529650 [ ]; | JPH05526004B [ ]; | JPH05243204 [ ] (NEC CORP); | JPH05522282B [ ]; | JPS56120406 [ ] (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD); | JPS59179405 [ ] (SUMITOMO RUBBER IND); | JPS538405B [ ]; | JPH05744482B [ ]; | JPS57142605U [ ]; | JPH05715007B [ ]; | JPS58112810 [ ] (YOKOHAMA RUBBER CO LTD) |