EP0266390 - A COMBINATION IMPLEMENT FOR DRESSING A GAME CARCASS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.09.1988 [1988/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELSETH, Robert Nils Ebbegardsgatan 3 S-434 00 Kungsbacka / SE | [1988/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/19] | Application number, filing date | 87902805.8 | 31.03.1987 | [1988/19] | WO1987SE00162 | Priority number, date | SE19860001683 | 15.04.1986 Original published format: SE 8601683 | [1988/19] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706102 | Date: | 22.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0266390 | Date: | 11.05.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A22B5/00, B26B1/00 | [1988/19] | CPC: |
A22B5/0023 (EP);
A22B5/168 (EP);
B26B1/00 (EP);
B26B5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/19] | Title | German: | KOMBIWERKZEUG ZUM ZERLEGEN VON WILD | [1988/19] | English: | A COMBINATION IMPLEMENT FOR DRESSING A GAME CARCASS | [1988/19] | French: | OUTIL COMBINE POUR DEPECER LE GIBIER | [1988/19] | File destroyed: | 30.08.1994 | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.1987 | Translation filed | Examination procedure | 18.01.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/38] | 14.04.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [1988/38] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 15.01.1988 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | FR   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | IT   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 15.01.1988 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 22.04.1988 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US732911 ; | [A]US1477510 ; | [A]US3241236 ; | [A]US3839788 ; | [A]US3883952 ; | [A]US3906627 |