EP0302075 - METHOD OF REDUCING THE ENERGY CONSUMPTION AT THE REFINING OF CELLULOSE-CONTAINING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1992 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STFI Box 5604 114 86 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/06] | For all designated states STFI Box 5604 S-114 86 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENGSTRAND, Per, Ossian Björnkärrsvägen 96 S-183 41 Täby / SE | 02 /
HTUN, Myat, Thoung Vinstavägen 60 S-162 24 Vällingby / SE | 03 /
HAMMAR, Lars-Ake Grumsgatan 3 S-123 44 Farsta / SE | 04 /
PETTERSSON, Rune, Lennart Alströmergatan 45 B S-112 47 Stockholm / SE | [1989/06] | Representative(s) | Hansson, Sven Arnold, et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Zacco & Bruhn Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Hansson, Sven A., et al AB STOCKHOLMS PATENTBYRA Zacco & Bruhn Box 23101 S-104 35 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1989/06] | Illum, Leif-Otto Svenska Cellulosa Aktiebolaget SCA Kungsgatan 33 S-111 56 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87902828.0 | 15.04.1987 | [1989/06] | WO1987SE00193 | Priority number, date | SE19860001779 | 18.04.1986 Original published format: SE 8601779 | [1989/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706280 | Date: | 22.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0302075 | Date: | 08.02.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.10.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 22.10.1987 | Classification | IPC: | D21B1/16 | [1989/06] | CPC: |
D21B1/16 (EP,US);
D21D1/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/27] |
Former [1989/06] | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MINDERUNG DES ENERGIEVERBRAUCHS BEI DER RAFFINAGE VON CELLULOSEHALTIGEN MATERIALIEN | [1989/06] | English: | METHOD OF REDUCING THE ENERGY CONSUMPTION AT THE REFINING OF CELLULOSE-CONTAINING MATERIAL | [1989/06] | French: | PROCEDE DE REDUCTION DE LA CONSOMMATION D'ENERGIE LORS DU RAFFINAGE D'UN MATERIAU CONTENANT DE LA CELLULOSE | [1989/06] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 06.09.1988 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: BE | 06.09.1988 | Examination requested [1989/06] | 21.11.1988 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.1989 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) IT | 13.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/20] | 04.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.11.1988 | IT   M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]SE303088 (DEFIBRATOR AB [SE]); | [A]SE318178 (ANGLO PAPER PROD LTD [CA]); | [A]SE78039740 ; | [A]US3186899 (MADISON ELMO H, et al); | [A]US4388148 (YAHRMARKT RICHARD A, et al) |