EP0306491 - ARC COATING OF REFRACTORY METAL COMPOUNDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA Morrill Hall 100 Church Street Southeast Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/11] | For all designated states THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA Morrill Hall, 100 Church Street Southeast Minneapolis, Minnesota 55455 / US | ||
Former [1989/11] | For all designated states REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF MINNESOTA 568 Administrative Services Center, 1919 University Avenue St. Paul, MN 55104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAMALINGAM, Subbiah 1715 West Eldridge Avenue Roseville, MN 55113 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Rongfeng 815 - 13th Avenue S.E. 216 Minneapolis, MN 55414 / US | [1989/11] | Representative(s) | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/29] | Cross, Rupert Edward Blount, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1989/11] | Wayte, Dennis Travers BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London, EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 87902978.3 | 01.04.1987 | [1989/11] | WO1987US00687 | Priority number, date | US19860848720 | 04.04.1986 Original published format: US 848720 | [1989/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8705948 | Date: | 08.10.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0306491 | Date: | 15.03.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.10.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0306491 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.10.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C23C14/22, C23C14/00, C23C14/32, H01J37/32 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
H01J37/32055 (EP,US);
C23C14/0021 (EP,US);
C23C14/325 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/11] | C23C14/22 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/11] | Title | German: | BOGENBESCHICHTUNG VON FEUERFESTEN METALLVERBINDUNGEN | [1989/11] | English: | ARC COATING OF REFRACTORY METAL COMPOUNDS | [1989/11] | French: | REVETEMENT A L'ARC DE COMPOSES METALLIQUES REFRACTAIRES | [1989/11] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.1988 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.1988 | Search fee paid | 29.09.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 04.10.1988 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 08.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 09.03.1994 | NL | 09.03.1994 | SE | 09.03.1994 | LU | 30.04.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/23] | NL | 09.03.1994 | |
SE | 09.03.1994 | ||
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [2000/06] | NL | 09.03.1994 | |
LU | 30.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | NL | 09.03.1994 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3625848 (SNAPER ALVIN A); | [X]US3956093 (MCLEOD PAUL S); | [X]US4444635 (KOBAYASHI SHIGERU [JP], et al); | [X]US4444643 (GARRETT CHARLES B [US]); | [X]US4511593 (BRANDOLF HENRY E [US]); | [X]US4563262 (SABLEV LEONID P [SU], et al); | [X]SU363375 (SABLEV L P [SU], et al) | Examination | WO8503954 |