EP0312529 - STRAIGHT CONNECTING HYDRAULIC QUICK COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.03.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.1992 | Refusal of application | published on 20.05.1992 [1992/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. 600 East Hurst Boulevard Fort Worth Texas 76053 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | For all designated states Bell Helicopter Textron Inc. 600 East Hurst Boulevard Fort Worth Texas 76053 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLSON, Rohn, Lee 5016 A Winder Court North Richland Hills, TX 76180 / US | 02 /
CAERO, Jose, German 4205 Clayton Road West Fort Worth, TX 76116 / US | [1989/17] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 D-22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87903164.9 | 29.04.1987 | [1989/17] | WO1987US00935 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8808499 | Date: | 03.11.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0312529 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 03.11.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16L29/00 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
F16L29/04 (EP,US);
F16L37/00 (KR);
Y10T137/87949 (EP,US);
Y10T137/87973 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/17] | Title | German: | HYDRAULISCHE SCHNELLVERSCHLUSSKUPPLUNG FÜR DIREKTE VERBINDUNG | [1989/17] | English: | STRAIGHT CONNECTING HYDRAULIC QUICK COUPLER | [1989/17] | French: | SYSTEME D'ACCOUPLEMENT HYDRAULIQUE RAPIDE POUR RACCORDEMENT DIRECT | [1989/17] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 11.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.1989 | Search fee paid | 11.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/27] | 23.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1992/21] | 27.12.1991 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1992/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2304390 (WOLFRAM JOHN N) | International search | [X]US3706318 (BANIADAM MAHMOOD, et al); | [A]US2436206 (DEMING MARK A) |