EP0267258 - NEEDLE FOR MULTIPLE VACUUM BLOOD SAMPLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.1994 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.03.1994 [1994/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celli, Goffredo Via Leopardi, 17 I-47040 Cerasolo Ausa-Coriano (FO) / IT | [1992/47] |
Former [1988/20] | For all designated states ROBERTI, Lamberto Via Bonini, 140 I-61100 Pesaro / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberti, Lamberto Via Bonini, 140 I-61100 Pesaro / IT | [1992/39] |
Former [1988/20] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Lanzoni, Luciano BUGNION S.p.A. Via A. Valentini 11/15 47922 Rimini / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/39] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via Cairoli, 107 I-47037 Rimini (Forli) / IT | ||
Former [1988/20] | Lanzoni, Luciano c/o BUGNION S.p.A. Via dei Mille, 19 I-40121 Bologna / IT | Application number, filing date | 87903390.0 | 13.05.1987 | [1988/20] | WO1987IT00044 | Priority number, date | IT19860004883 | 14.05.1986 Original published format: IT 488386 | IT19860003627 | 30.12.1986 Original published format: IT 362786 | [1988/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706813 | Date: | 19.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0267258 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0267258 | Date: | 07.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/14, A61M5/32 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
A61B5/154 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP,US);
A61B5/150496 (EP,US);
A61B5/150732 (EP,US);
A61M5/32 (EP,US);
A61B5/150389 (EP,US);
A61M2005/342 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1988/20] | Title | German: | KANÜLE FÜR VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ANSAUGEN VON MEHRFACHEN BLUTPROBEN DURCH UNTERDRUCK | [1988/20] | English: | NEEDLE FOR MULTIPLE VACUUM BLOOD SAMPLE DEVICES | [1988/20] | French: | AIGUILLE POUR DISPOSITIFS DE PRELEVEMENT SOUS-VIDE D'ECHANTILLONS SANGUINS MULTIPLES | [1988/20] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 08.11.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.10.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.12.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 14.12.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/13] | Request for further processing for: | 01.07.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 25.06.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.08.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.11.1989 | 31.05.1991 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3434468 [ ] (BARR COURTLAND H SR, et al); | US3520292 [ ] (BARR COURTLAND H SR, et al); | US4409990 [ ] (MILEIKOWSKY GIL N [US]) |