EP0270608 - COATED DETERGENT ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1991 [1991/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé 2880 Bagsværd / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1989/45] | For all designated states NOVO NORDISK A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | ||
Former [1988/24] | For all designated states NOVO INDUSTRI A/S Novo Allé DK-2880 Bagsvaerd / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALHOLT, Per Lyngbyvej 345B DK-2820 Gentofte / DK | [1988/24] | Representative(s) | Brown, John D., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/24] | Brown, John David, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87903686.1 | 19.05.1987 | [1988/24] | WO1987DK00057 | Priority number, date | DK19860002355 | 21.05.1986 Original published format: DK 235586 | DK19860005805 | 03.12.1986 Original published format: DK 580586 | [1988/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8707292 | Date: | 03.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0270608 | Date: | 15.06.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.12.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0270608 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | C11D7/42 | [1988/24] | CPC: |
C11D3/0084 (EP,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,US);
C11D3/38672 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/24] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTETE WASCHMITTELENZYME | [1988/24] | English: | COATED DETERGENT ENZYMES | [1988/24] | French: | ENZYMES DETERGENTS ENROBES | [1988/24] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1990/34: Divisional application 88100604 filed on 18.01.88 | Entry into regional phase | 18.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 18.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.05.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 10.05.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP88100604.3 / EP0277532 | Opposition(s) | 23.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.05.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0193829 (MILES LAB [US]); | [A]DE2435008 (NOVO TERAPEUTISK LABOR AS); | [AP]EP0206417 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) | by applicant | GB1554482 | BE888632 | US4011169 | GB1362365 | US4106991 | EP0170360 | GB2135347 | GB1294557 | JPS60190497 | FR2058421 | - "How Enzymes Got into Detergents", CLAUS DAMBMANN; POUL HOLM; VILLY JENSEN; MOGENS HILMER NIELSEN, Developments in Industrial Microbiology, a publication of the Society for Industrial Microbiology, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (1971), vol. 12 | - "Production of Microbial Enzymes", KNUD AUNSTRUP; OTTO ANDRESEN; EDVARD A. FALCH; TAGE KJAER NIELSEN; P.N. CHRISTENSEN; K. THOMSEN; S. BRANNER, Microbial Technology, ACADEMIC PRESS, (1979), pages 281 - 311 | - MANUFACTURING CHEMIST, (198608), pages 35 - 37 | - FETTE SEIFEN ANSTRICHMITTEL 88, (1986), pages 159 - 165 | - ACTA PHARMACEUTICA TECHNOLOGICA, (1985), vol. 31, no. 1, pages 38 - 41 |