EP0317629 - METHOD OF MEASURING DEPTH OF SURFACE OPENING DEFECTS OF A SOLID MATERIAL BY USING ULTRASONIC WAVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Construction Machinery Co., Ltd. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0004 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states HITACHI CONSTRUCTION MACHINERY CO., LTD. 6-2, Ohtemachi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MIYAJIMA, Takeshi 1801 Banchi, Oaza Sakayori Makabemachi, Makabe-gun Ibaraki 300-44 / JP | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1989/22] | Wagner, Karl H. WAGNER & GEYER Patentanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87903745.5 | 08.06.1987 | [1989/22] | WO1987JP00358 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8809931 | Date: | 15.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317629 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317629 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01N29/04 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
G01N29/11 (EP,US);
G01N29/0618 (EP,US);
G01N29/07 (EP,US);
G01N29/2487 (EP,US);
G01N29/30 (EP,US);
G01N29/40 (EP,US);
G01N29/4445 (EP,US);
G01N2291/02854 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0421 (EP,US);
G01N2291/0422 (EP,US);
G01N2291/044 (EP,US);
G01N2291/056 (EP,US);
G01N2291/101 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/22] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER TIEFE VON OBERFLÄCHENUNEBENHEITSFEHLERN EINES FESTEN MATERIALS UNTER VERWENDUNG VON ULTRASCHALLWELLEN | [1989/22] | English: | METHOD OF MEASURING DEPTH OF SURFACE OPENING DEFECTS OF A SOLID MATERIAL BY USING ULTRASONIC WAVES | [1989/22] | French: | PROCEDE POUR MESURER LA PROFONDEUR DE DEFAUTS D'OUVERTURE DE SURFACE DANS UN MATERIAU SOLIDE AU MOYEN D'ONDES ULTRASONIQUES | [1989/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.1989 | Translation filed | 08.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.1989 | Search fee paid | 08.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.06.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.06.1989 | Examination requested [1989/32] | 24.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 06.09.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH05710450 ; | [A]JPH0585385 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP) |