EP0269702 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE FOR MOUTH CARE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAVID, Gerhard Kurfürstendamm 48 D-10707 Berlin / DE | For all designated states MASER, Brigitte Hohenzollerndamm 50 D-14199 Berlin / DE | [1988/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASER, Brigitte Hohenzollerndamm 50 D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/23] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner Kurfürstendamm 170 D-10707 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 87903857.8 | 16.06.1987 | [1988/23] | WO1987DE00276 | Priority number, date | DE19863620295 | 16.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3620295 | [1988/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8707500 | Date: | 17.12.1987 | Language: | DE | [1987/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269702 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.12.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0269702 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61C17/16, A61H13/00 | [1991/51] | CPC: |
A61H13/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/23] | A61H13/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/23] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHES GERÄT FÜR DIE MUNDPFLEGE | [1988/23] | English: | ELECTRICAL DEVICE FOR MOUTH CARE | [1988/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE POUR LES SOINS BUCCAUX | [1988/23] | Entry into regional phase | 27.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 27.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.01.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.1988 | Examination requested [1988/23] | 20.11.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
20.08.1992
01.09.1992
ADMISSIBLE Braun AG Patentabteilung Postfach 11 20 D-61466 Kronberg / DE | [1992/42] | 22.10.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.02.1993 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 04.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 16.03.1993 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1993/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.12.1991 | FR | 18.12.1991 | GB | 18.12.1991 | IT | 18.12.1991 | NL | 18.12.1991 | SE | 18.12.1991 | AT | 01.06.1992 | CH | 30.06.1992 | LI | 30.06.1992 | LU | 30.06.1992 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/42] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
GB | 18.12.1991 | ||
IT | 18.12.1991 | ||
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
FR | 07.05.1992 | ||
AT | 01.06.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [2002/16] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
CH | 18.12.1991 | ||
GB | 18.12.1991 | ||
IT | 18.12.1991 | ||
LI | 18.12.1991 | ||
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
FR | 07.05.1992 | ||
AT | 01.06.1992 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1999/52] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
GB | 18.12.1991 | ||
IT | 18.12.1991 | ||
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
FR | 07.05.1992 | ||
AT | 01.06.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
LU | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
GB | 18.12.1991 | ||
IT | 18.12.1991 | ||
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
FR | 07.05.1992 | ||
AT | 01.06.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1998/37] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
GB | 18.12.1991 | ||
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
FR | 07.05.1992 | ||
AT | 01.06.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1993/13] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
GB | 18.12.1991 | ||
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
FR | 07.05.1992 | ||
CH | 30.06.1992 | ||
LI | 30.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
FR | 07.05.1992 | ||
Former [1992/37] | BE | 18.12.1991 | |
NL | 18.12.1991 | ||
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/33] | NL | 18.12.1991 | |
SE | 18.12.1991 | ||
Former [1992/28] | SE | 18.12.1991 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE539735 (WILLIAM F STICHT); | [X]CH358408 (WYDLER ALBERT [CH]); | [Y]DE2410175 (PATRA PATENT TREUHAND [LI]); | [Y]US4115893 (NAKATA YUICHI, et al); | [A]DE3001382 (VOWLES ALEXANDER E) |