EP0269708 - MACHINE FOR MAKING COVERINGS OF CONCRETE AND SIMILAR PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1991 [1991/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CIRAUD, Pierre 23, rue d'Isly F-16100 Cognac / FR | [1988/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/23] | Representative(s) | Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073 69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/42] | Ropital-Bonvarlet, Claude Cabinet BEAU DE LOMENIE 51, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 7073 F-69301 Lyon Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 87903887.5 | 17.06.1987 | [1988/23] | WO1987FR00224 | Priority number, date | FR19860008742 | 17.06.1986 Original published format: FR 8608742 | [1988/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8707921 | Date: | 30.12.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0269708 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.12.1987 | Classification | IPC: | E01C19/48, E01C19/42, E01C19/40 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
E01C19/4833 (EP);
E01C19/405 (EP);
E01C19/42 (EP);
E01C19/4866 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB, IT [1988/42] |
Former [1988/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ERSTELLEN VON BETON- UND ÄHNLICHEN DECKEN | [1988/23] | English: | MACHINE FOR MAKING COVERINGS OF CONCRETE AND SIMILAR PRODUCTS | [1988/23] | French: | MACHINES POUR L'EXECUTION DE CHAPES EN BETON ET PRODUITS ANALOGUES | [1988/23] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.1988 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/38] | 12.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/01] | 30.07.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 30.06.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   18.08.1988 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.1989 | 02.07.1990 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US1565657 [ ]; | EP0076323 [ ] |