EP0317556 - DISTILLATION APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.12.1992 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.12.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.02.1993 [1993/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAQUA LIMITED 89 Moore Street Leichhardt, New South Wales 2040 / AU | [1992/02] |
Former [1989/22] | For all designated states SALFON PTY. LIMITED 81 Old Pittwater Road Brookvale, NSW 2100 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENCER, Colin, William 54 Serpentine Road Bilgola, NSW 2107 / AU | [1989/22] | Representative(s) | Marshall, Monica Anne, et al GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Marshall, Monica Anne, et al GALLAFENT & CO. 8 Staple Inn London WC1V 7QH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87904214.1 | 18.06.1987 | [1989/22] | WO1987AU00177 | Priority number, date | AU19860006512 | 18.06.1986 Original published format: AU 651286 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8707847 | Date: | 30.12.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317556 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0317556 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 30.12.1987 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B01D1/04 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
B01D3/101 (EP,US);
B01D1/02 (EP,US);
B01D3/00 (EP,US);
B01D3/007 (EP,US);
B01D3/10 (EP,US);
B01D3/106 (EP,US);
C02F1/16 (EP,US);
Y02A20/124 (EP,US);
Y10S203/04 (EP,US);
Y10S203/13 (EP,US);
Y10S203/16 (EP,US);
Y10S203/19 (EP,US);
Y10S203/90 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1989/22] | Title | German: | DESTILLIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [1989/22] | English: | DISTILLATION APPARATUS AND METHOD | [1989/22] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE DISTILLATION | [1989/22] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1988 | Search fee paid | 20.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.01.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 20.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 14.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 14.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.11.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.12.1988 | M02   Fee paid on   21.01.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]GB2186564 (LASATER HENRY CATES) | International search | [Y]GB834467 (BADGER MFG COMPANY); | [Y]GB939188 (NIREX INGENIOR AKTIESELSKAB); | [Y]AU1964070 ; | [Y]US3558436 (FOLEY NORMAN L, et al); | [Y]US4366030 (ANDERSON MAX F); | [Y]US4525243 (MILLER STANLEY [US]) |