EP0272312 - EFFERVESCENT GRANULAR MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION, AND USE OF SAID MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.11.1991 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gergely, Gerhard, Dr. Gartengasse 8 A-1050 Wien / AT | [1988/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERGELY, Irmgard Gartengasse 8 A-1050 Wien / AT | 02 /
GERGELY, Stefan, M. Gartengasse 8 A-1050 Wien / AT | 03 /
GERGELY, Thomas Gartengasse 8 A-1050 Wien / AT | 04 /
GERGELY, Gerhard Gartengasse 8 A-1050 Wien / AT | [1988/26] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/26] | Goddar, Heinz J., Dr., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87904519.3 | 24.06.1987 | [1988/26] | WO1987EP00331 | Priority number, date | DE19863621432 | 26.06.1986 Original published format: DE 3621432 | DE19863627475 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: DE 3627475 | [1988/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8800009 | Date: | 14.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0272312 | Date: | 29.06.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272312 | Date: | 23.01.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A23L2/40, A61K9/46 | [1988/26] | CPC: |
A23L2/40 (EP,US);
A61K9/0007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES BRAUSEGRANULATES, DANACH HERGESTELLTES BRAUSEGRANULAT SOWIE DESSEN VERWENDUNG | [1988/26] | English: | EFFERVESCENT GRANULAR MATERIAL, PROCESS FOR ITS PRODUCTION, AND USE OF SAID MATERIAL | [1988/26] | French: | MATERIAU GRANULAIRE EFFERVESCENT, PROCEDE POUR SA FABRICATION, ET UTILISATION DUDIT MATERIAU | [1988/26] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.1988 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/26] | 06.12.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.07.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 19.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US3102075 [ ] (RUTH MILLARD); | US3359119 [ ] (MILTON CHARLES H); | US3401216 [ ] (VINCENT COLETTA); | DE3149517 [ ] (GERGELY GERHARD); | AT374348B [ ] (GERGELY GERHARD [AT]); | DE3434774 [ ] (GERGELY GERHARD) |