EP0274504 - PORTABLE WORK BENCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKILTEN TOOLS LIMITED 36 Reynards Road Welwyn Hertfordshire AL6 9TP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/29] | For all designated states SKILTEN TOOLS LIMITED 36 Reynards Road Welwyn Hertfordshire AL6 9TP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SKARSTEN, Stephen Randolph 36 Reynards Road Welwyn Hertfordshire AL6 9PT / GB | [1988/29] | Representative(s) | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Garratt, Peter Douglas, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | ||
Former [1988/29] | Garratt, Peter Douglas Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 87904546.6 | 15.07.1987 | [1988/29] | WO1987GB00501 | Priority number, date | GB19860017216 | 15.07.1986 Original published format: GB 8617216 | [1988/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8800514 | Date: | 28.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0274504 | Date: | 20.07.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0274504 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B25H1/06, B25H1/08 | [1988/29] | CPC: |
B23Q9/00 (EP,US);
B25H1/06 (EP,US);
B25H1/08 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8763 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/27] |
Former [1988/29] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | TRAGBARE WERKBANK | [1988/29] | English: | PORTABLE WORK BENCH | [1988/29] | French: | ETABLI MOBILE | [1988/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.1988 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/29] | 09.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Request for further processing for: | 08.07.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 08.07.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.07.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1992 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   10.10.1992 | 31.07.1993 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.01.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 20.04.1994 | [2002/23] | Cited in | International search | US3070138 [ ] (BAASLAND TORJUS G); | EP0098101 [ ] (HILTON PRODUCTS [GB]); | EP0148617 [ ] (MERITCRAFT LTD [GB]); | US4239195 [ ] (OLTMAN JOHN P [US], et al); | US3342226 [ ] (MARCOUX HENRY J, et al); | US4350193 [ ] (MCCAMBRIDGE JAMES, et al); | EP0015400 [ ] (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]); | US4483573 [ ] (KELLER DAVID L [US]); | FR2530936 [ ] (FESTO MASCHF STOLL G [DE]); | DE2819033 [ ] (STANLEY WERKE GMBH); | WO8402102 [ ] (GORJAT JEAN) |