EP0314694 - AIRFIELD MARKER LIGHT OPERATING AT A RELATIVELY LOW TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.1991 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANSCH AB Flyghamnsvägen 22 S-183 64 Täby / SE | [1989/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAHLBERG, Anders Flyghamnsvägen 22 S-183 64 Täby / SE | [1989/19] | Representative(s) | Modin, Jan, et al Ehrner & Delmar Patentbyra AB Box 10316 100 55 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/19] | Modin, Jan, et al c/o Axel Ehrners Patentbyra AB Box 10316 S-100 55 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87904649.8 | 06.07.1987 | [1989/19] | WO1987SE00324 | Priority number, date | SE19860003029 | 07.07.1986 Original published format: SE 8603029 | [1989/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8800315 | Date: | 14.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0314694 | Date: | 10.05.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F21V29/00, F21M1/00 | [1989/19] | CPC: |
F21V29/89 (EP);
B64F1/205 (EP,US);
F21V29/74 (EP);
F21W2111/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/19] | Title | German: | NIEDRIGER TEMPERATUR WIRKENDE MARKIERLEUCHTE FÜR FLUGPLÄTZE | [1989/19] | English: | AIRFIELD MARKER LIGHT OPERATING AT A RELATIVELY LOW TEMPERATURE | [1989/19] | French: | BALISE DE TERRAIN D'AVIATION, FONCTIONNANT A UNE TEMPERATURE RELATIVEMENT BASSE | [1989/19] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.1988 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.02.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 20.12.1988 | Examination requested [1989/19] | 15.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/26] | 25.01.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3007034 (REED GEORGE A, et al); | [A]US3066217 (MCDONALD CLEMENT J); | [A]US3155321 (MCDONALD CLEMENT J); | [A]DE2925842 (META FER AG) |