EP0276255 - GEAR SHIFT COUPLING, SPECIALLY FOR AUTOMATIC GEARS OF MOTOR VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.1994 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Meyerle, Michael Kiefernweg 9 D-88074 Meckenbeuren / DE | [1988/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/31] | Representative(s) | Münich, Wilhelm, et al Dr. Münich & Kollegen Anwaltskanzlei Wilhelm-Mayr-Strasse 11 80689 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Münich, Wilhelm, Dr., et al Kanzlei Münich, Steinmann, Schiller Wilhelm-Mayr-Str. 11 D-80689 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/52] | Wendl, Christl Schlossplatz 2 Postfach 1329 D-7758 Meersburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 87904678.7 | 20.07.1987 | [1988/31] | WO1987DE00324 | Priority number, date | DE19863624894 | 23.07.1986 Original published format: DE 3624894 | DE19873700813 | 14.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3700813 | [1988/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8800661 | Date: | 28.01.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0276255 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0276255 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.01.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F16D25/061, B60T1/00 | [1988/31] | CPC: |
B60T1/005 (EP);
F16D25/061 (EP);
F16H2200/2064 (EP);
F16H47/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1988/31] | Title | German: | SCHALTKUPPLUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR AUTOMATISCH SCHALTBARE KRAFTFAHRZEUGGETRIEBE | [1988/31] | English: | GEAR SHIFT COUPLING, SPECIALLY FOR AUTOMATIC GEARS OF MOTOR VEHICLES | [1988/31] | French: | EMBRAYAGE DE CHANGEMENT DE VITESSE, EN PARTICULIER POUR BOîTES AUTOMATIQUES DE VEHICULES A MOTEUR | [1988/31] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.1988 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/31] | 01.06.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 03.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 24.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/08] | Request for further processing for: | 16.09.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   02.10.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US2428336 [ ]; | CH224022 [ ]; | DE3237096 [ ]; | GB1050930 [ ]; | DE1193317 [ ]; | FR2217589 [ ]; | US3272295 [ ]; | DE686130 [ ]; | US2710086 [ ]; | DE3121694 [ ]; | US3679032 [ ]; | DE1575802 [ ] |