EP0275323 - FERROMAGNETIC RECORDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.1995 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.04.1995 [1995/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIMAI, Hideyoshi Sony Magnetic Products, Inc. 5-6, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | 02 /
AOKI, Yoshio Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Christopher Hugo, et al D. Young & Co, 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1988/30] | Application number, filing date | 87904732.2 | 16.07.1987 | [1988/30] | WO1987JP00519 | Priority number, date | JP19860180416 | 31.07.1986 Original published format: JP 18041686 | [1988/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801093 | Date: | 11.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0275323 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275323 | Date: | 20.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.02.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10, G11B5/02 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
G11B11/10528 (EP,US);
G11B11/10 (KR);
G11B11/1051 (EP,US);
G11B11/1053 (EP,US);
G11B11/10536 (EP,US);
G11B5/02 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1988/30] | Title | German: | FERROMAGNETISCHES AUFZEICHNUNGSGERÄT | [1988/30] | English: | FERROMAGNETIC RECORDING APPARATUS | [1988/30] | French: | APPAREIL D'ENREGISTREMENT PHOTOMAGNETIQUE | [1988/30] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.1988 | Translation filed | 12.04.1988 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.1988 | Search fee paid | 12.04.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/30] | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0164745 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) | [X] - APPLIED OPTICS. vol. 25, no. 4, February 1986, NEW YORK US pages 483 - 489; M.Ojima et al: "Compact magnetooptical disk for coded data storage" | International search | [P]JPH06266449 (FURUTA KATSUHISA, et al); | [P]JPS62134838 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JPS61153875 (CANON KK) |