EP0323460 - A BODY SUPPORTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.1992 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUTCHER, Ian Donald Unit 7 25 Sholl Street Mandurah Western Australia / AU | For all designated states KANZLER, Graham Leslie Bernhard 18 Ardeana Crescent Albany Western Australia / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | For all designated states Butcher, Ian Donald Unit 7 25 Sholl Street Mandurah Western Australia / AU | ||
For all designated states Kanzler, Graham Leslie Bernhard 18 Ardeana Crescent Albany Western Australia / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanzler, Graham Leslie Bernhard 18 Ardeana Crescent Albany Western Australia, 6330 / AU | [1989/29] |
Former [1989/28] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 87905159.7 | 14.08.1987 | [1989/28] | WO1987AU00264 | Priority number, date | AU19860007453 | 15.08.1986 Original published format: AU 745386 | [1989/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801158 | Date: | 25.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323460 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 25.02.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61G7/00, A61G7/04, A61G7/06, // A47C20/04 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
A47C20/048 (EP,US);
A61G7/001 (EP,US);
A61G7/0525 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/28] | Title | German: | KÖRPERSTÜTZANORDNUNG | [1989/28] | English: | A BODY SUPPORTING APPARATUS | [1989/28] | French: | APPAREIL DE SUPPORT DU CORPS | [1989/28] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.1989 | Search fee paid | 25.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 25.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 12.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 09.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/39] | 28.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1992/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1024312 (VICKERS LTD); | [X]US4287620 (ZUR HENRY C); | [E]EP0262771 (TURNBLADE LTD [GB]) | International search | [X]FR1422606 ; | [X]FR1499275 ; | [X]US3392412 (ROBERT AYMAR JULIAN); | [Y]US3477071 (EMERSON JOHN H); | [Y]US3667075 (BALLARD WESLEY D); | [Y]US3775781 (BRUNO J, et al); | [X]GB1474018 (WATKINS WATSON LTD); | [X]WO8303196 (MOULTON LEE APTONE); | [X]EP0092197 (BENESCH FRED); | [XP]US4639960 (QUILLEN JEFFREY B [US], et al) |