EP0318495 - APPARATUS FOR TREATMENT OF FIBRE SUSPENSIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1991 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUNDS DEFIBRATOR INDUSTRIES AKTIEBOLAG 851 94 Sundsvall / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states SUNDS DEFIBRATOR INDUSTRIES AKTIEBOLAG S-851 94 Sundsvall / SE | ||
Former [1989/23] | For all designated states SUNDS DEFIBRATOR AKTIEBOLAG S-851 94 Sundsvall / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REINHALL, Rolf, Bertil P O Box 7299 Bellevue, WA 98007 / US | [1989/23] | Representative(s) | Sundqvist, Hans Sunds Defibrator Industries Aktiebolag Patents Department Strandbergsgatan 61 112 51 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Sundqvist, Hans Sunds Defibrator Industries Aktiebolag Patents Dept. Strandbergsgatan 61 S-112 51 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1990/18] | Sundqvist, Hans Svenska Cellulosa Aktiebolaget SCA Kungsgatan 33 S-111 56 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1989/23] | Illum, Leif-Otto Svenska Cellulosa Aktiebolaget SCA Kungsgatan 33 S-111 56 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 87905298.3 | 20.07.1987 | [1989/23] | WO1987SE00341 | Priority number, date | SE19860003346 | 07.08.1986 Original published format: SE 8603346 | [1989/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8800992 | Date: | 11.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0318495 | Date: | 07.06.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0318495 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 11.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | D21B1/30, D21D1/30 | [1989/23] | CPC: |
D21D1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, SE [1989/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FASERSUSPENSIONEN | [1991/05] | English: | APPARATUS FOR TREATMENT OF FIBRE SUSPENSIONS | [1989/23] | French: | APPAREIL POUR TRAITER DES SUSPENSIONS DE FIBRES | [1989/23] |
Former [1989/23] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON FASERSUSPENSIONEN | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 17.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/23] | 08.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.10.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 30.01.1991 | [1991/35] | Cited in | International search | [A]DE438247 (CARL F LINDSTROEM, et al); | [Y]SE86309 ; | [X]SE134912 ; | [Y]US2741954 (HENRI ALLIBE AIME LOUIS); | [A]US2909334 (HOLGER NILSSON NILS GUNNAR, et al); | [A]US3138336 (EMILE LEJEUNE, et al); | [A]US3144994 (DANFORTH DONALD W); | [A]US3427690 (HAUG ANTON J); | [A]DE2611886 (FINCKH MASCHF); | [Y]SE441758 (SUNDS DEFIBRATOR [SE]) |