EP0323462 - USE OF INTERLEUKIN-1 TO INDUCE DEVELOPMENT OF MULTIPOTENT HEMOPOIETIC CELL POPULATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.06.1993 [1993/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Immunex Corporation Immunex Building 51 University Street Seattle, WA 98101 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | For all designated states IMMUNEX CORPORATION Immunex Building 51 University Street Seattle, WA 98101 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSMAN, David, John 116 11th Avenue East, No. 501 Seattle, WA 98102 / US | [1989/28] | Representative(s) | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | Froud, Clive, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 87905329.6 | 20.07.1987 | [1989/28] | WO1987US01671 | Priority number, date | US19860891929 | 30.07.1986 Original published format: US 891929 | [1989/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8800969 | Date: | 11.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323462 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0323462 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 11.02.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | A61K37/02, A61K37/36 | [1990/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/545 (EP,US);
A61K38/2006 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/2006, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K38/20, A61K38/193 (EP,US) |
Former IPC [1989/28] | C12N5/00, C07K15/00, A61K37/10, A61K37/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/28] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON INTERLEUKIN-1 ZUR INDUZIERUNG DER BILDUNG VON MULTIPOTENTEN HÄMOPOIETISCHEN ZELLPOPULATIONEN | [1989/28] | English: | USE OF INTERLEUKIN-1 TO INDUCE DEVELOPMENT OF MULTIPOTENT HEMOPOIETIC CELL POPULATIONS | [1989/28] | French: | UTILISATION DE L'INTERLEUKINE-1 POUR INDUIRE LE DEVELOPPEMENT DE POPULATIONS DE CELLULES HEMOPOIETIQUES MULTIPOTENTES | [1989/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.1989 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.1989 | Search fee paid | 17.01.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 18.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 22.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO8706954 (GENETICS INST [US]) | International search | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 104, No. 25, issued 1986, June 23, (Columbus, Ohio, USA), J. W. SCHRADER et al, "Structural Homologies Among the Hemopoietins", see pages 473-474, columns 2 and 1, the Abstract No. 223263e, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci U.S.A. 1986, 83 (8), 2458-62 (Eng). | [AP] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 106, No. 17, issued 1987 April 27 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), D. RENNICK et al, "Control of Hemopoiesis by a Bone Marrow Stromal Cell Clone : Lipopolysaccharide- and Interleukin-1-Inducible Production of Colony Stimulating Factors", see page 351 column 1, the Abstract No. 136807h, Blood 1987, 69(2), 682-91 (Eng). | [Y] - Journal of Cellular Physiology, Volume 122, issued 1985 January, S. H. BARTELMEZ, et al., "Synergism Between Hemopoietic Growth Factors (HGFs) Detected by their Effects on Cells Bearing Receptors for a Lineage specific HGF : Assay of Hemopoietin-1" see pages 370-378. | [Y] - Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, Volume 82, issued 1985 May, P. T. JUBINSKY et al, "Purification of Hemopoietin 1 : a Multilineage Hemopoietic Growth Factor" see pages 2764-2768. | [Y] - Cell, Volume 45, issued 1986 June, E. R. STANLEY et al, "Regulation of very Primitive, Multipotent Hemopoietic Cells by Hemopoietin-1" see pages 667-674. | [Y] - Immunology Today, Volume 7, No. 2 issued 1986 February, J. J. OPPENHEIM et al, "There is more than one Interleukin-1" see pages 45-56. | [A] - Ann. Rev., Immunol. Volume 3, issued 1985, S. K. DURUM et al, "Interleukin-1 an Immunological Perspective" see pages 263-287. | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, Volume 106, No. 17, issued 1987 April 27 (Columbus, Ohio, USA), D. Rennick et al, "Control of Hemopoiesis by a Bone Marrow Stromal Cell Clone: Lipopolysaccharide-and Interleukin-l-inducible Production of Colony-Stimulating Factors", see page 351 column 1, the abstract No. 136807h, Blood 1987, 69 (2), 682-91 (Eng). |