EP0332613 - PULSE SHAPER FOR INDUCTIVE TRANSMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.1991 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.09.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.11.1991 [1991/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Wernerstrasse 1 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/38] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GmbH Wernerstrasse 1 D-70469 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIRSCHNER, Michael Humboldstrasse 57 D-7530 Pforzheim / DE | [1989/38] | Application number, filing date | 87905427.8 | 27.08.1987 | [1989/38] | WO1987DE00380 | Priority number, date | DE19863639947 | 22.11.1986 Original published format: DE 3639947 | [1989/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8804053 | Date: | 02.06.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0332613 | Date: | 20.09.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0332613 | Date: | 14.11.1990 | Language: | DE | [1990/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01P3/481 | [1989/38] | CPC: |
G01P3/481 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1989/38] | Title | German: | IMPULSFORMER FÜR INDUKTIVE GEBER | [1989/38] | English: | PULSE SHAPER FOR INDUCTIVE TRANSMITTER | [1989/38] | French: | SYSTEME DE MISE EN FORME POUR TRANSMETTEURS INDUCTIFS | [1989/38] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1989 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 12.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/38] | 21.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JP5949014 [ ]; | FR2171777 [ ] (ITT [US]); | DE3226073 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | WO8300193 [ ] (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 8, Nr. 139 (E-253) (1576), 28. Juni 1984, siehe das ganze dokument & JP, A, 5949014 (Mitsubishi Denki K.K.) 21. Marz 1984, & JP5949014 A 00000000 |