EP0279832 - ENZYMATIC PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.11.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.11.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CELLTECH LIMITED 216 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/35] | For all designated states CELLTECH LIMITED 216 Bath Road Slough Berkshire SL1 4EN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, Alan, David 12 Station Terrace Twyford Berkshire RG10 9NE / GB | [1988/35] | Representative(s) | Votier, Sidney David, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [1988/35] | Application number, filing date | 87905636.4 | 03.09.1987 | [1988/35] | WO1987GB00616 | Priority number, date | GB19860021377 | 04.09.1986 Original published format: GB 8621377 | [1988/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801650 | Date: | 10.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0279832 | Date: | 31.08.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C12P21/02 | [1988/35] | CPC: |
C12P21/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/35] | Title | German: | ENZYMATISCHES VERFAHREN | [1988/35] | English: | ENZYMATIC PROCESS | [1988/35] | French: | PROCEDE ENZYMATIQUE | [1988/35] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.1988 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.1988 | Examination requested [1988/35] | 26.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/03] | 16.08.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4086136 [ ]; | US4293648 [ ]; | EP0074095 [ ]; | EP0124313 [ ]; | US4436925 [ ]; | JPH0641499 [ ] | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 103, 1985, (Columbus, Ohio, US), see page 579, Abstract 194943y, & JP, A, 6041499 (Asahi Chemical Industry Co.Ltd) 5 March 1985 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 104, 1986, (Columbus, Ohio, US), R. SEETHARAM et al. : "Synthetic Potential of Staphylococcus Aureus V8-Protease: an Approach Toward Semisynthesis of Covalent Analogs of alpha-Chain of Hemoglobin", see page 313, Abstract 84604b, & J. Cell. Biochem. 1986, 30(1)87-99 | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 103, 1985, (Columbus, Ohio, US), H.D. JAKUBKE et al.: "Basic Principles of Protease-Catalyzed Joining of Peptide Bonds", see page 237, Abstract 2502j, & Angew. Chem. 1985, 97(2)79-87 |