EP0324745 - TOPICAL AGENTS CONTAINING PROSTACYCLINE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1989/30] | TOPICAL AGENT CONTAINING PROSTACYCLINE DERIVATIVES | ||
[1995/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schering Aktiengesellschaft 13342 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states SCHERING AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-13342 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EKERDT, Roland, Dr. Bondickstr. 81 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | 02 /
RAPTIS, Georg, Dr. Miquelstr. 77 D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | 03 /
PAULS, Alfred, Dr. Veitstr. 17 D-1000 Berlin 27 / DE | [1995/02] |
Former [1989/30] | 01 /
EKERDT, Roland Bondickstrasse 81 D-1000 Berlin 28 / DE | ||
02 /
RAPTIS, Georg Miquelstrasse 77 D-1000 Berlin 33 / DE | |||
03 /
PAULS, Alfred Gerviniusstrasse 22 D-1000 Berlin 12 / DE | Application number, filing date | 87905715.6 | 01.09.1987 | [1989/30] | WO1987DE00401 | Priority number, date | DE19863631169 | 11.09.1986 Original published format: DE 3631169 | [1989/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801867 | Date: | 24.03.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324745 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324745 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.03.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/557, A61K31/34 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/34 (EP);
A61K31/557 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | PROSTACYCLINDERIVATE ENTHALTENDE MITTEL FÜR DIE TOPISCHE ANWENDUNG | [1989/30] | English: | TOPICAL AGENTS CONTAINING PROSTACYCLINE DERIVATIVES | [1995/02] | French: | AGENTS TOPIQUES CONTENANT DES DERIVES DE PROSTACYCLINE | [1995/02] |
Former [1989/30] | TOPICAL AGENT CONTAINING PROSTACYCLINE DERIVATIVES | ||
Former [1989/30] | AGENT TOPIQUE CONTENANT DES DERIVES DE PROSTACYCLINE | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.12.1987 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 09.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 28.06.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.07.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 13.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Request for further processing for: | 13.09.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 13.09.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.01.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | EP0011591 [ ] (SCHERING AG [DE]); | WO8600808 [ ] (SCHERING AG [DE]); | EP0171992 [ ] (MITSUBISHI YUKA PHARMA [JP], et al) | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 101, Nr. 21, 19. November 1984, (Columbus, Ohio, US), R. EKERDT et al.: "Blood Supply can be Increased in Rabbit Skin by a Stable Prostacyclin Derivative without Potentiation of Plasma Extravasation", siehe seite 152, Zusammenfassung 184795w, & Br. J. Dermatol., Suppl. 1984, 111(27), 144-6 | Examination | - Chemical Abstracts, volume 101, No. 21, 19 Nov. 1984, (Columbus, 0hio, US), R. Ekerdt et al.: "Blood supply can be increased in rabbit skin by a stable prostacyclin derivative without protentiation of plasma extravasation", p. 152, abstract 184795w | - Dorland's Illustrated Medical Dictionary, 26th ed., W.B. Saunders Co., pp. 1417-1418 |