EP0317576 - COMPOSITE MATERIALS AND METHOD OF PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.03.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.1994 | Refusal of application | published on 11.05.1994 [1994/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CONGOLEUM CORPORATION 195 Belgrove Drive Kearny, NJ 07035 / US | [1989/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSE, Reginald, Eugene 310 Fair Avenue Westminster, MD 21157 / US | 02 /
MORTON, John, Fraser 771 Old Manchester Road Westminster, MD 21157 / US | 03 /
FOWLER, Joseph, Allen 82 West Green Street Westminster, MD 21157 / US | 04 /
PIACENTE, Anthony, Niel 147 Franklin Corner Road Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | 05 /
BUHNER, Robert, Walter Box 308, RD 2 Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | 06 /
BAILEY, William, J. 269 Essex Road Warminster, PA 18947 / US | 07 /
PEARSON, John, Douglas 12 Sunset Court Hamilton Township, NJ 08690 / US | 08 /
JACKEY, Philip, Albert 408 Sutherland Road Ewing, NJ 18618 / US | [1989/31] |
Former [1989/22] | 01 /
GROSE, Reginald, Eugene 310 Fair Avenue Westminster, MD 21157 / US | ||
02 /
MORTON, John, Fraser 771 Old Manchester Road Westminster, MD 21157 / US | |||
03 /
FOWLER, Joseph, Allen 82 West Green Street Westminster, MD 21157 / US | |||
04 /
PIACENTE, Anthony, Niel 147 Franklin Corner Road Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 / US | |||
05 /
BUHNER, Robert, Walter Box 308, RD 2 Ringoes, NJ 08551 / US | |||
06 /
BAILEY, William, J. 1228 New Rogers Road Apartment F-5 Levittown, PA 19056 / US | |||
07 /
PEARSON, John, Douglas 12 Sunset Court Hamilton Township, NJ 08690 / US | |||
08 /
JACKEY, Philip, Albert 408 Sutherland Road Ewing, NJ 18618 / US | Representative(s) | Green, Alan James, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/22] | Green, Alan James, et al SANDERSON & CO. European Patent Attorneys 34, East Stockwell Street Colchester Essex CO1 1ST / GB | Application number, filing date | 87905828.7 | 11.08.1987 | [1989/22] | WO1987US01980 | Priority number, date | US19860896423 | 13.08.1986 Original published format: US 896423 | [1989/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801319 | Date: | 25.02.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0317576 | Date: | 31.05.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.02.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.02.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | D21H5/18 | [1989/22] | CPC: |
D21H13/40 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/22] | Title | German: | KOMPOSIT-MATERIALIEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [1989/22] | English: | COMPOSITE MATERIALS AND METHOD OF PREPARATION | [1989/22] | French: | MATERIAUX COMPOSITES ET PROCEDE DE PREPARATION | [1989/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 06.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 06.03.1989 | Search fee paid | 06.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 13.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 23.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.02.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.12.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1994/19] | 20.12.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4245689 (GRARD HENRY P, et al); | [Y]US3039914 (REIMAN PETER A); | [Y]US4545854 (GOMEZ DANIEL [FR], et al); | [Y]US4269657 (GOMEZ DANIEL, et al); | [YP]US4680223 (BITHER PETER G [US]); | [Y]US4274916 (GROSE REGINALD E); | [YP]US4609431 (GROSE REGINALD E [US], et al); | [A]US4426470 (WESSLING RITCHIE A [US], et al); | [A]US4011130 (WORDEN ROBERT A); | [Y]EP0097974 (HERCULES INC [US]) | [Y] - Casey, Pulp and Paper, Volume II, 3rd Edition (1980) JOHN WILEY & Sons, pages 950 and 951 |