EP0374139 - MULTI-AXIS BEVEL AND HYPOID GEAR GENERATING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 16.05.2003 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE GLEASON WORKS 1000 University Avenue Rochester New York 14692 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states THE GLEASON WORKS 1000 University Avenue Rochester New York 14692 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRENZER, Theodore, J. 7615 East River Road West Rush, NY 14587 / US | 02 /
HUNKELER, Ernst, J. 4911 Calle De Los Flores HC03 Box 4891 Cave Creek Arizona 85331 / US | [1990/34] |
Former [1990/26] | 01 /
KRENZER, Theodore, J. 7615 East River Road West Rush, NY 14587 / US | ||
02 /
HUNKELER, Ernst, J. 22 Bittersweet Road Fairport, NY 14450 / US | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/28] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/26] | Harrison, David Christopher MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 87905863.4 | 24.08.1987 | [1990/26] | WO1987US02083 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8901838 | Date: | 09.03.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0374139 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.1989 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0374139 | Date: | 22.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/04] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0374139 | Date: | 02.07.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | B23F9/00 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
B23F9/10 (EP,US);
B23F23/006 (EP,US);
B23F9/00 (EP,US);
B23F9/025 (EP,US);
Y10T409/103975 (EP,US);
Y10T409/104134 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/30] |
Former [1990/26] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | MEHRFACHACHSENZAHNRADWÄLZMASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KEGELRÄDERN UND HYPOIDRÄDERN | [1990/26] | English: | MULTI-AXIS BEVEL AND HYPOID GEAR GENERATING MACHINE | [1990/26] | French: | MACHINE A TAILLER DES DENTS BISEAUTEES ET DES ENGRENAGES HYPOIDES | [1990/26] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1997/04: (deleted) | EPB 1997/04: (deleted) | EPB 1997/04: (deleted) | EPB 1996/03: Teilanmeldung 95117666.8 eingereicht am 09/11/95 | EPB 1996/03: Divisional application 95117666.8 filed on 09/11/95 | EPB 1996/03: Demande divisionnaire 95117666.8 déposée le 09/11/95 | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1990 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1990 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.02.1990 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1989 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 22.02.1990 | Examination requested [1990/26] | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.12.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 18.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.07.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.08.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Divisional application(s) | EP95117666.8 / EP0709157 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.1997
25.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Oerlikon Geartec AG Turbinenstrasse 17 CH-8023 Zürich / CH Opponents representative Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | 02
01.10.1997
25.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Klingelnberg Söhne GmbH Peterstr. 45 DE-42499 Hückeswagen / DE Opponents representative Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.1997
25.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Oerlikon Geartec AG Turbinenstrasse 17 CH-8023 Zürich / CH Opponents representative Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | ||
02
01.10.1997
25.11.1997
ADMISSIBLE Klingelnberg Söhne GmbH Peterstr. 45 DE-42499 Hückeswagen / DE Opponents representative Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | |||
Former [1997/48] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.10.1997
Oerlikon Geartec AG Turbinenstrasse 17 CH-8023 Zürich / CH Opponents representative Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | ||
02
01.10.1997
Klingelnberg Söhne GmbH Peterstr. 45 DE-42499 Hückeswagen / DE Opponents representative Menges, Rolf Ackmann Menges Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 14 04 31 80454 München / DE | 13.10.1997 | No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition | 28.11.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 06.07.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.07.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.07.1999 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 05.11.2002 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 04.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 05.05.2003 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 15.09.1999 | Appeal received No. T0898/99 | 26.11.1999 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.11.2002 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 05.11.2002 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.11.2002 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.01.1997 | FR | 22.01.1997 | [2006/32] |
Former [2004/14] | AT | 22.01.1997 | Cited in | International search | SU724287 [ ] (EXNII METALLOREZH STANKOV [SU]); | DE3643967 [ ] (YUTAKA SEIMITSU KOGYO LTD [JP]); | WO8404064 [ ] (INGERSOLL MILLING MACHINE CO [US]); | US4211511 [ ] (KOTTHAUS ERICH [CH]); | US3984746 [ ] (DINSDALE JACK, et al) | [A] - B.A. Shtipelman: "Design and Manufacture of Hypoid Gears", 1978, John Wiley & Sons, (New York, US), pages x, 125-127 |