EP0297112 - FLAME RETARDED MODIFIED POLYPHENYLENE ESTERS HAVING IMPROVED FLOW CHARACTERISTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.01.1990 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.01.1990 | Change - withdrawal | published on 07.03.1990 [1990/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200 West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | For all designated states GREAT LAKES CHEMICAL CORPORATION Highway 52 Northwest P.O. Box 2200 West Lafayette Indiana 47906 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FIDELLE, Thomas, Patrick P.O. Box 2628 West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 02 /
LUDWIG, Charles, Turner 3604 Capilano Drive West West Lafayette, IN 47906 / US | 03 /
NULPH, Robert, John 1320 Lockwood Drive Lafayette, IN 47905 / US | [1989/01] | Representative(s) | Bond, Bentley George, et al Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/01] | Bond, Bentley George, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 87906011.9 | 08.09.1987 | [1989/01] | WO1987US02288 | Priority number, date | US19860931239 | 14.11.1986 Original published format: US 931239 | [1989/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803542 | Date: | 19.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0297112 | Date: | 04.01.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.05.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/12 | [1989/01] | CPC: |
C08L71/123 (EP);
C08K5/12 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L71/123, C08L2666/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1989/01] | Title | German: | POLYPHENYLENESTER MODIFIZIERT ZUR VERBESSERTEN FLAMMVERZÖGERNDEN WIRKUNG UND MIT VERBESSERTEN | [1989/21] | English: | FLAME RETARDED MODIFIED POLYPHENYLENE ESTERS HAVING IMPROVED FLOW CHARACTERISTICS | [1989/01] | French: | ETHERS DE POLYPHENYLENES MODIFIES A INFLAMMATION RETARDEE POSSEDANT DES CARACTERISTIQUES D'ECOULEMENT AMELIOREES | [1989/01] |
Former [1989/01] | FLAMMHEMMENDE MODIFIZIERTE POLYPHENYLENESTER MIT VERBESSERTEN FLIESSEIGENSCHAFTEN | File destroyed: | 29.10.1997 | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.1988 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.1988 | Search fee paid | 12.01.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.1988 | Examination requested [1989/01] | 11.12.1989 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/10] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.10.1989 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YP]WO8701713 ; | [E]US4695594 ; | [Y]JPS6090256 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 233 (C-304)[1956]19th September 1985; & JP-A-60 90 256 (MITSUBISHI GAS KAGAKU K.K.) 21-05-1985 | International search | US3772342 [ ]; | US3775165 [ ]; | US3887647 [ ]; | US4203931 [ ]; | US4154712 [ ]; | US4200702 [ ]; | JPS474798B [ ] |