EP0323511 - METHOD OF LOW-TEMPERATURE NITROCARBURIZING OF STEEL ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.11.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GORODETSKY, Daniil Borisovich ul. N. Ostrovskogo, 14a-12 Kiev 252035 / SU | For all designated states KHAITIN, Boris Sheilikovich bulvar Shevchenko, 58-31 Kiev 252032 / SU | For all designated states VITCHUK, Rafail Akimovich ul. Malinovskogo, 3b-104 Kiev 252212 / SU | [1989/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1989/28] | Representative(s) | von Füner, Alexander, et al v. Füner Ebbinghaus Finck Hano Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1989/28] | von Füner, Alexander, Dr., et al Patentanwälte v. Füner, Ebbinghaus, Finck Mariahilfplatz 2 & 3 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87906035.8 | 16.06.1987 | [1989/28] | WO1987SU00067 | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8810320 | Date: | 29.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0323511 | Date: | 12.07.1989 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 29.12.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C23C8/32 | [1989/28] | CPC: |
C23C8/76 (EP);
C23C8/32 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1989/28] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM TIEFTEMPERATURNITROKARBURIEREN VON STAHLGEGENSTÄNDEN | [1989/28] | English: | METHOD OF LOW-TEMPERATURE NITROCARBURIZING OF STEEL ARTICLES | [1989/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE NITROCARBURATION A BASSE TEMPERATURE DE PRODUITS EN ACIER | [1989/28] | File destroyed: | 02.03.1998 | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.1989 | Translation filed | 06.02.1989 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.1989 | Search fee paid | 06.02.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.1989 | Examination requested [1989/28] | 05.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 06.11.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.07.1990 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 92, 1980, Seite 186, Zusammenfassung Nr. 184207b, Columbus, Ohio, US; T.P. SEROSHTAN et al.: "Use of polymers in the thermochemical treatment of metals", & FIZ.-KHIM. MEKH. MATER. 1980, 16(1), 107-9 | International search | [Y]SU432240 ; | [Y]SU1161585 (DEEV VIKTOR P [SU], et al) |