EP0267282 - CHROMATOGRAPHIC APPARATUS AND PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.1990 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BATTELLE DEVELOPMENT CORPORATION 505 King Avenue Columbus, OH 43201-2693 / US | [1988/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Siu-Leung 3959 Ritamarie Drive Columbus, OH 43220 / US | [1988/20] | Representative(s) | Dousse, Blasco, et al 73, Avenue de Mategin 1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1988/20] | Dousse, Blasco, et al 7, route de Drize CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 87906042.4 | 22.04.1987 | [1988/20] | WO1987US00896 | Priority number, date | US19860855544 | 23.04.1986 Original published format: US 855544 | [1988/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8706492 | Date: | 05.11.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0267282 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.11.1987 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.11.1987 | Classification | IPC: | B01D15/08, B01J20/32 | [1988/20] | CPC: |
B01J20/287 (EP);
B01D15/325 (EP);
B01D15/361 (EP);
B01J20/286 (EP);
B01J20/3204 (EP);
B01J20/3212 (EP);
B01J20/3219 (EP);
B01J20/3265 (EP);
B01J2220/52 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/20] | Title | German: | CHROMATOGRAPHISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN | [1988/20] | English: | CHROMATOGRAPHIC APPARATUS AND PROCESS | [1988/20] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL CHROMATOGRAPHIQUE | [1988/20] | File destroyed: | 27.06.1996 | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.1987 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.1987 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.1987 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.1987 | Examination requested [1988/20] | 09.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1990 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1990/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | US4520122 [ ]; | GB2115716 [ ] |