EP0393021 - RADIO FREQUENCY SURGICAL TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.08.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ORAL ROBERTS UNIVERSITY 8181 S. Lewis Tulsa, OK 74135 / US | [1990/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMANASHI, William, S. 107 East G Street Jenks, OK 74137 / US | 02 /
PATIL, Arun, Angelo 3709 E. 69th Place Tulsa, OK 74136 / US | [1990/43] | Representative(s) | Smith, Philip Antony, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [1990/43] | Application number, filing date | 87906364.2 | 10.09.1987 | [1990/43] | WO1987US02329 | Priority number, date | US19860906791 | 12.09.1986 Original published format: US 906791 | [1990/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8801851 | Date: | 24.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0393021 | Date: | 24.10.1990 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1990/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.03.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/39 | [1990/43] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/082 (EP,US);
A61B18/12 (EP,US);
A61B18/18 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/43] | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENZCHIRURGISCHES WERKZEUG | [1990/43] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY SURGICAL TOOL | [1990/43] | French: | INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL DE HAUTE FREQUENCE | [1990/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 13.03.1989 | National basic fee paid | 13.03.1989 | Search fee paid | 13.03.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.03.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT | 13.03.1989 | Examination requested [1990/43] | 01.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/40] | 30.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.10.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   23.10.1990 | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents have been disclosed. | International search | [A]US1807105 (ERWIN SCHLIEPHAKE); | [Y]US3566877 (SMITH LUTHER B, et al); | [X]US4154246 (LEVEEN HARRY H [US]); | [A]US4534347 (TAYLOR LEONARD S [US]) | [A] - Electrocomponent Science and Terminology Volume 1, Number 2, issued December 1974, PC THACKERY, "Indirect Heating Source for Treatment of Malignant Brain Tumors" see pages 91-96 |