EP0289542 - CONTROL SYSTEM FOR ELECTRICAL LIGHTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.06.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.08.1993 [1993/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ECONOLIGHT LIMITED 8-10 Bulstrode Street London W1 / GB | [1988/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAWRENCE, John Arthur LaBurnham House Nutley, East Sussex TN22 3LX / GB | 02 /
FINCH, David Alan Redroof Cottage, Crowborough Road Nutley, East Sussex / GB | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley & Co. 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 87907013.4 | 26.10.1987 | [1988/45] | WO1987GB00756 | Priority number, date | GB19860025690 | 27.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8625690 | GB19860025691 | 27.10.1986 Original published format: GB 8625691 | [1988/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803353 | Date: | 05.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289542 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289542 | Date: | 26.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/04, H05B41/392 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
H05B41/42 (EP,US);
H05B41/048 (EP,US);
Y10S315/05 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | KONTROLLSYSTEM FÜR ELEKTRISCHE BELEUCHTUNG | [1988/45] | English: | CONTROL SYSTEM FOR ELECTRICAL LIGHTING | [1988/45] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMANDE D'UN ECLAIRAGE ELECTRIQUE | [1988/45] | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 05.09.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.05.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.04.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1990 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   24.04.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | FR1479474 [ ] (RAILAX RECH S ET APPLKICATIONS); | EP0150237 [ ] (MARAI MECHANIK UND ELEKTRONIK [DE]) |