EP0287630 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONSTANT ANGLE OF INCIDENCE SCANNING IN ION BEAM SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.08.1992 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VARIAN ASSOCIATES, INC. 3100 Hansen Way Palo Alto California 94304 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | For all designated states VARIAN ASSOCIATES, INC. 611 Hansen Way Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PEDERSEN, Bjorn, O. 3 Comanche Circle Chelmsford, MA 01824 / US | 02 /
POLLOCK, John, D. Kittery Avenue Rowley, MA 01969 / US | 03 /
MOBLEY, Richard, M. 40 Upper River Road Ipswich, MA 01938 / US | [1988/43] | Representative(s) | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al EDWARD EVANS BARKER Clifford's Inn, Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/43] | Cline, Roger Ledlie, et al EDWARD EVANS & CO. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 87907058.9 | 29.09.1987 | [1988/43] | WO1987US02506 | Priority number, date | US19860916534 | 08.10.1986 Original published format: US 916534 | [1988/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8802920 | Date: | 21.04.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0287630 | Date: | 26.10.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.04.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G21K5/00 | [1988/43] | CPC: |
H01J37/1477 (EP);
H01J37/3171 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1989/02] |
Former [1988/43] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ABTASTEN MIT KONSTANTEM EINFALLSWINKEL IN IONENSTRAHLSYSTEMEN | [1988/43] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CONSTANT ANGLE OF INCIDENCE SCANNING IN ION BEAM SYSTEMS | [1988/43] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE BALAYAGE A ANGLE D'INCIDENCE CONSTANT POUR SYSTEMES A FAISCEAUX D'IONS | [1988/43] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.1988 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.1988 | Search fee paid | 17.06.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/44] | 23.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.03.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/40] | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.07.1988 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 08.07.1988 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 08.07.1988 | CH   M02   Not yet paid | 08.07.1988 | DE   M02   Not yet paid | 08.07.1988 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 08.07.1988 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1991 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP53119670 ; | [X]JP59041828 ; | [A]JP60240125 ; | [AD]US4457359 (HOLDEN SCOTT C [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 2, no. 150, 15th December 1978, page 9671 E 78; & JP-A-53 119 670 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 19-10-1978, & JP53119670 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 131 (E-251)[1568], 19th June 1984; & JP-A-59 041 828 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 08-03-1984, & JP59041828 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 99 (E-396)[2156], 16th April 1986; & JP-A-60 240 125 (FUJITSU K.K.) 29-11-1985, & JP60240125 A 00000000 | International search | [Y]GB1438851 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC); | [Y]US4101813 (PARKER NORMAN W, et al); | [A]US4117339 (WOLFE JOHN EDMOND); | [Y]US4282294 (LEE TZUO-CHANG, et al); | [Y]US4367411 (HANLEY PETER R, et al); | [Y]US4577111 (SAITOU NORIO [JP], et al); | [Y]US4590379 (MARTIN FREDERICK W [US]); | [YP]US4661712 (MOBLEY RICHARD M [US]); | [XE]US4700077 (DYKSTRA JERALD P [US], et al) |