EP0289623 - RADAR-TYPE UNDERGROUND PROSPECTING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1994 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD 1 Hiranomachi 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka, 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/45] | For all designated states OSAKA GAS CO., LTD 1 Hiranomachi 5-chome, Higashi-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka, 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Akio 808-153, Higashigaokacho Kishiwada-shi Osaka 596 / JP | 02 /
TSUNASAKI, Masaru 387-33, Hikisounishicho Sakai-shi Osaka 591 / JP | [1988/45] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/45] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 87907340.1 | 04.11.1987 | [1988/45] | WO1987JP00852 | Priority number, date | JP19860266405 | 08.11.1986 Original published format: JP 26640586 | JP19870140436 | 03.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14043687 | [1988/45] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803656 | Date: | 19.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0289623 | Date: | 09.11.1988 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0289623 | Date: | 29.09.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.05.1988 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/34, G01S13/88 | [1988/45] | CPC: |
G01S7/34 (EP,US);
G01S13/0209 (EP,US);
G01S13/885 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/45] | Title | German: | RADARGERÄT ZUR UNTERGRUNDERFORSCHUNG | [1988/45] | English: | RADAR-TYPE UNDERGROUND PROSPECTING APPARATUS | [1988/45] | French: | INSTALLATION DE PROSPECTION DU TYPE A RADAR | [1988/45] | Entry into regional phase | 07.07.1988 | Translation filed | 07.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 07.07.1988 | Search fee paid | 07.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 03.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 30.11.1993 | [2000/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3806795 (MOREY R); | [AP]US4706031 (MICHIGUCHI YOSHIHIRO [JP], et al) | International search | JPS57176710U [ ]; | US4502009 [ ] (RODIERE CHARLES [FR], et al); | JPS61112283U [ ] |