EP0327585 - ALKYLPHENOLS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF VIA PHENOL ALKYLATION BY CRACKED PETROLEUM DISTILLATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.1991 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.1991 | Change - withdrawal | published on 09.10.1991 [1991/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390 180 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | For all designated states EXXON RESEARCH AND ENGINEERING COMPANY P.O.Box 390, 180 Park Avenue Florham Park, New Jersey 07932-0390 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSWALD, Alexis, A. 10 Cynthia Court Annandale, NJ 08801 / US | 02 /
BHATIA, Ram, N. 4710 Park Forest Drive Baton Rouge, LA 70816 / US | 03 /
MOZELESKI, Edmund, J. 267 Road 3 Hoffman Drive Califon, NJ 07830 / US | 04 /
BROWNAWELL, Darrell, W. 320 Roberts Lane Scotch Plains, NJ 07076 / US | 05 /
ASHCRAFT, Thomas, L. P.O. Box 3903 Baytown, TX 77520 / US | [1989/33] | Representative(s) | Bawden, Peter Charles EXXON CHEMICAL LIMITED European Patents and Licences Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.O. Box 1, Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/33] | Bawden, Peter Charles EXXON CHEMICAL LIMITED Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 87907486.2 | 26.10.1987 | [1989/33] | WO1987US02790 | Priority number, date | US19860922877 | 24.10.1986 Original published format: US 922877 | [1989/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803133 | Date: | 05.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0327585 | Date: | 16.08.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.05.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.05.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C07C149/30, C07C148/02, C07C143/44, C07C141/16, C07C43/205, C07C39/16, C07C39/06, C07F9/18 | [1989/33] | CPC: |
C07C37/14 (EP,US);
C07C303/02 (EP);
C07F9/18 (EP);
C07G99/0024 (EP);
C09K23/00 (EP);
C09K23/12 (EP,US);
C10L1/326 (EP);
C10M135/10 (EP);
C10M159/22 (EP);
C10M2219/087 (EP);
C10M2219/088 (EP);
C10M2219/089 (EP);
C10M2223/045 (EP);
C10N2010/04 (EP);
C10N2040/25 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C303/02, C07C309/04 (EP);
C07C37/14, C07C39/06 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/33] | Title | German: | ALKYLPHENOLE UND DERIVATE DAVON VIA PHENOLALKYLIERUNG VON PETROLEUMDERIVATEN | [1989/33] | English: | ALKYLPHENOLS AND DERIVATIVES THEREOF VIA PHENOL ALKYLATION BY CRACKED PETROLEUM DISTILLATES | [1989/33] | French: | ALKYLPHENOLS ET LEURS DERIVES, OBTENUS PAR ALKYLATION PHENOLIQUE DE DISTILLATS DE PETROLE DE CRAQUAGE | [1989/33] | File destroyed: | 08.03.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.1989 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.1989 | Search fee paid | 17.04.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 17.04.1989 | Examination requested [1991/33] | 09.08.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1991/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.09.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.1989 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   05.12.1989 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2504064 (BOCK LOUIS H, et al); | [Y]US3265722 (DUDLEY JAMES R); | [Y]US3367867 (ABBOTT ANDREW D, et al); | [Y]US3619123 (WALZ KLAUS, et al); | [Y]US3830850 (STRATTON C); | [Y]US3968062 (ECSEDY ROBERT N); | [Y]US4283321 (CHAKRABARTI PARITOSH M, et al); | [Y]US4418222 (HONNEN LEWIS R [US]); | [Y]US4442042 (SCHMITT KIRK D [US]); | [Y]US4496495 (CASPARI GUNTER J [US], et al) |