EP0324798 - FAILURE SWITCH FOR BRAKING SYSTEM PROPORTIONING VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corporation) Columbia Road and Park Avenue P.O. Box 2245R Morristown New Jersey 07960 / US | ||
Former [1989/30] | For all designated states ALLIED CORPORATION Law Department(F.M. Leather) P.O. Box 2245-R Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BACH, Lloyd, Gene 61500 Greentree South Bend, IN 46614 / US | 02 /
GAISER, Robert, Frank 5843 Ponderosa Drive Stevensville, MI 49127 / US | [1989/30] | Representative(s) | Lejet, Christian BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad 93700 Drancy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/49] | Lejet, Christian BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1989/30] | Lejet, Christian BENDIX FRANCE Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126 rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | Application number, filing date | 87907882.2 | 03.11.1987 | [1989/30] | WO1987US02890 | Priority number, date | US19860935872 | 28.11.1986 Original published format: US 935872 | [1989/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803885 | Date: | 02.06.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0324798 | Date: | 26.07.1989 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1989/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0324798 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/26 | [1989/30] | CPC: |
B60T8/94 (EP,US);
B60T8/26 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1989/30] | Title | German: | FEHLERSCHALTER FÜR PROPORTIONALVENTILE IN BREMSSYSTEMEN | [1989/30] | English: | FAILURE SWITCH FOR BRAKING SYSTEM PROPORTIONING VALVE | [1989/30] | French: | COMMUTATEUR DE DEFAILLANCE POUR VANNE DE REGULATION PROPORTIONNELLE DE LA PRESSION D'UN SYSTEME DE FREINAGE | [1989/30] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Entry into regional phase | 29.04.1989 | National basic fee paid | 29.04.1989 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.04.1989 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.1988 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 29.04.1989 | Examination requested [1989/30] | 03.11.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 19.12.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.12.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.04.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.01.1992 | IT | 15.01.1992 | SE | 15.01.1992 | [2007/52] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 15.01.1992 | |
SE | 15.01.1992 | ||
FR | 05.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/46] | SE | 15.01.1992 | |
FR | 05.06.1992 | ||
Former [1992/32] | SE | 15.01.1992 | Cited in | International search | GB2100376 [ ] (NISSIN KOGYO KK); | GB2166823 [ ] (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) | Examination | - Patent Abstracts of Japan, volume 10, no. 242 (M-509) (2298), 21 August 1986 |