EP0290571 - METHOD FOR FABRICATING A CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT WITH A HYDRAULIC BINDER, ELEMENT THUS OBTAINED AND BUILDING METHOD USING SUCH ELEMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.1993 [1993/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BROUARD, Jean Charles Louis Eugène Les Bureaux F-45170 Saint-Lyé-la-Forêt / FR | [1988/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1988/46] | Representative(s) | Ramey, Daniel, et al Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/46] | Ramey, Daniel, et al Cabinet Ores 6 Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 87907968.9 | 26.11.1987 | [1988/46] | WO1987FR00472 | Priority number, date | FR19860016577 | 27.11.1986 Original published format: FR 8616577 | [1988/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO8803916 | Date: | 02.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0290571 | Date: | 17.11.1988 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.1988 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1988/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0290571 | Date: | 29.07.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C04B28/14, C04B40/02, E04B2/52, C04B14/06 | [1988/46] | CPC: |
C04B40/0259 (EP,US);
C04B28/14 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00068 (EP,US);
C04B2111/00301 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B28/14, C04B14/06, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0259 (EP,US);
C04B40/0259, C04B28/14, C04B40/0028, C04B40/0071 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/46] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES EIN HYDRAULISCHES BINDEMITTEL ENTHALTENDEN BAUELEMENTS, DAS ERHALTENE ELEMENT UND KONSTRUKTIONSVERFAHREN MITTELS SOLCHER ELEMENTE | [1988/46] | English: | METHOD FOR FABRICATING A CONSTRUCTION ELEMENT WITH A HYDRAULIC BINDER, ELEMENT THUS OBTAINED AND BUILDING METHOD USING SUCH ELEMENTS | [1988/46] | French: | PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN ELEMENT DE CONSTRUCTION A BASE DE LIANT HYDRAULIQUE, ELEMENT AINSI OBTENU ET PROCEDE DE CONSTRUCTION A PARTIR DE CES ELEMENTS | [1988/46] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.1988 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.1988 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.1988 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.1988 | Examination requested [1988/46] | 24.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 01.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | BE505518 [ ]; | DE385454 [ ] (CARL BRANDT DIPL ING); | FR615791 [ ]; | FR915121 [ ]; | US2696102 [ ] (ZAGRAY HAROLD F); | CH306575 [ ] (SCHOEPFER JOSEF [CH], et al); | DE1903347 [ ] (COAL INDUSTRY PATENTS LTD); | DE2032261 [ ]; | FR2311638 [ ] (REIMERS HINRICH [FR]); | DE2805523 [ ] (RHONE POULENC IND); | GB2024887 [ ] (LYGO H) |