EP0272250 - Process for the production of neodym alloys [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1988/25] | Neodynium alloys and their production process | ||
[1992/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer 92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/25] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC CHIMIE 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seon, Françoise 170, avenue du président Wilson F-93100 Montreuil / FR | 02 /
Boudot, Bernard 146m boulevard Diderot F-75012 Paris / FR | [1988/25] | Representative(s) | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude, et al Rhodia Services Direction Propriété Industrielle 40, Rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude, et al Rhodia Services Direction Propriété Industrielle 40, rue de la Haie-Coq 93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR | ||
Former [1988/25] | Dutruc-Rosset, Marie-Claude, et al RHONE-POULENC INTERSERVICES Service Brevets Chimie 25, Quai Paul Doumer F-92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 88100014.5 | 22.06.1984 | [1988/25] | Priority number, date | FR19830011139 | 05.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8311139 | FR19830014392 | 09.09.1983 Original published format: FR 8314392 | [1988/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0272250 | Date: | 22.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0272250 | Date: | 30.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | C22B5/04, C22C28/00, C22B59/00 | [1988/25] | CPC: |
C22B5/04 (EP,US);
C22C28/00 (EP,KR,US);
C22B59/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Neodymlegierungen | [1992/16] | English: | Process for the production of neodym alloys | [1992/16] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'alliages de néodyme | [1992/16] |
Former [1988/25] | Neodymlegierungen und deren Herstellungsverfahren | ||
Former [1988/25] | Neodynium alloys and their production process | ||
Former [1988/25] | Alliages de néodyme et leur procédé de fabrication | Examination procedure | 11.10.1988 | Examination requested [1988/49] | 07.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.07.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.03.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 19.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP84401307.8 / EP0134162 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/38] | Request for further processing for: | 07.08.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 15.08.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.09.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.06.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.06.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.06.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.1992 | GB | 22.06.1993 | SE | 23.06.1993 | BE | 30.06.1993 | CH | 30.06.1993 | LI | 30.06.1993 | LU | 30.06.1993 | [2000/06] |
Former [1994/41] | AT | 30.09.1992 | |
GB | 22.06.1993 | ||
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
BE | 30.06.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/26] | AT | 30.09.1992 | |
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
BE | 30.06.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 30.09.1992 | |
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
CH | 30.06.1993 | ||
LI | 30.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 30.09.1992 | |
SE | 23.06.1993 | ||
Former [1994/16] | SE | 23.06.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR489155 (MAURICE DUBURGUET [FR]); | [A]US1648954 (WESLEY MARDEN JOHN); | [A]FR986924 ; | [A]US3186834 (SCHECHTER DALE L, et al); | [A]US3295963 (DESIRE GALVIN PAUL); | [YD]AT329884B (TREIBACHER CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [AT]) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, 1980, page 379, résumé no. 226435c, Columbus, Ohio, US; V.D. SAVIN et al.: "Kinetics of the reduction of cerium and neodymium from chlorides by calcium", & ZH. FIZ. KHIM. 1980, 54(9), 2241-5 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, 1981, page 213, résumé no. 195573k, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.N. ZVIADADZE et al.: "Kinetics of aluminothermal reduction of neodymium from fluoride", & IZV. AKAD. NAUK SSSR, Met. 1981 (1), 14-17 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, 1981, page 463, résumé no. 157685m, Columbus, Ohio, US; G.N. ZVIADADZE et al.: "Thermodynamics of the aluminothermal reduction of scandium, yttrium, and neodymium from fluorides", & DEPOSITED DOC. 1980, VINITI, 1804-80, 19pp. | [A] - GMELIN HANDBUCH DER ANORGANISCHEN CHEMIE, partie B2, système no. 39, pages 214-215, Springer Verlag, Berlin, DE | [A] - M. BOUISSIERES et al.: "Nouveau traité de chimie minérale", tome VII, 1959, pages 488-525, Masson Editeurs | [A] - CHIMIE ET INDUSTRIE, vol. 77, no. 2, février 1957, pages 277-288, Société de productions documentaires, Rueil-Malmaison, FR; F. TROMBE: "Préparation et propriétés des métaux des terres rares" | Examination | - O.Kubaschewski, "Iron-Binary Phase Diagrams", 1982, pages 101 et 102 |