EP0293543 - Image duplicating apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 13.11.1998 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MINOLTA CO., LTD. Osaka Kokusai Building, 3-13, 2-chome, Azuchi-Machi, Chuo-ku Osaka / JP | [1997/09] |
Former [1988/49] | For all designated states Minolta Camera Kabushiki Kaisha Osaka Kokusai Building 30, Azuchi-machi 2-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hanamoto, Hiroyuki 9-1, Nishi-Akatsuchi Yawata-Cho Toyokawa-Shi Aichi-Ken / JP | 02 /
Higashio, Kimihiko 168-30, Ninchi Yawata-Cho Toyokawa-Shi Aichi-Ken / JP | 03 /
Ito, Masazumi 3-13, 2-Chome Higashiwaki Toyohashi-Shi Aichi-Ken / JP | [1988/49] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Postfach 26 01 62 80058 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62 D-80058 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100066.5 | 05.01.1988 | [1988/49] | Priority number, date | JP19870133091 | 28.05.1987 Original published format: JP 13309187 | JP19870143551 | 08.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14355187 | JP19870143552 | 08.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14355287 | JP19870143553 | 08.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14355387 | JP19870143554 | 08.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14355487 | JP19870143555 | 08.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14355587 | JP19870143556 | 08.06.1987 Original published format: JP 14355687 | [1988/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0293543 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0293543 | Date: | 03.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0293543 | Date: | 30.12.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/53] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/01, G03G15/00 | [1988/49] | CPC: |
G03G15/50 (EP,US);
G03G15/01 (EP,US);
G03G15/36 (EP,US);
G03G15/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1988/49] | Title | German: | Bildvervielfältigungsgerät | [1988/49] | English: | Image duplicating apparatus | [1988/49] | French: | Appareil de duplication d'images | [1988/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.1989 | Examination requested [1989/31] | 29.05.1989 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 24.10.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.1989 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 23.02.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.08.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.12.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.1992
12.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Avabridge Limited Dashwood House 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1PE / GB Opponent's representative Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
02.04.1992
12.05.1992
ADMISSIBLE Avabridge Limited Dashwood House 69 Old Broad Street London EC2M 1PE / GB Opponent's representative Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | 15.05.1992 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 25.11.1992 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 01.03.1994 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 14.05.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.10.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 13.05.1994 | Appeal received No. T0414/94 | 27.07.1994 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.05.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 14.05.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 19.05.1998 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP60166970 ; | [X]JP60166969 ; | [XP]JP6285265 ; | [A]US3914043 (MCVEIGH JAMES H); | [A]DE3605472 (CANON KK [JP]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 12 (P-421)[2069], 17th January 1986; & JP-A-60 166 970 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 30-08-1985, & JP60166970 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 12 (P-421)[2069], 17th January 1986; & JP-A-60 166 969 (MATSUSHITA DENKI SANGYO K.K.) 30-08-1985, & JP60166969 A 00000000 | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 291 (P-618)[2738], 19th September 1987; & JP-A-62 85 265 (KONISHIROKU PHOTO IND. CO., LTD) 18-04-1987 (Cat. X), & JP6285265 A 00000000 |