EP0279168 - Circuit for the power supply of a multitude of consumers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.1994 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mehnert, Walter, Dr. Grillparzerstr. 6 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states Mehnert, Walter, Dr. Grillparzerstrasse 6 D-85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [1988/34] | For all designated states MITEC Moderne Industrietechnik GmbH Daimlerstrasse 13 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/23] |
Former [1988/34] | 01 /
Mehnert, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Ing. Grillparzerstrasse 6 D-8012 Ottobrunn / DE | Representative(s) | Strasser, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rudolf-Diesel-Strasse 14 85521 Ottobrunn-Riemerling / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/46] | Strasser, Wolfgang, et al Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Keilitz Rosenheimer Landstrasse 87 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [1988/34] | Strasser, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys, et al Patentanwälte Strohschänk, Uri, Strasser & Englaender Innere Wiener Strasse 8 D-81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100182.0 | 08.01.1988 | [1988/34] | Priority number, date | DE19873702517 | 28.01.1987 Original published format: DE 3702517 | [1988/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0279168 | Date: | 24.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0279168 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0279168 | Date: | 05.05.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.1988 | Classification | IPC: | H02H3/00 | [1988/34] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP);
H02H1/003 (EP);
H02H3/07 (EP);
H02H3/087 (EP);
B60R16/0315 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/34] | Title | German: | Schaltungsanordnung zur Stromversorgung einer Vielzahl von Verbrauchern | [1988/34] | English: | Circuit for the power supply of a multitude of consumers | [1988/34] | French: | Circuit pour l'alimentation de courant d'une pluralité de consommateurs | [1988/34] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 08.02.1988 | Examination requested [1988/34] | 01.03.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.11.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/17] | Request for further processing for: | 27.12.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 27.12.1991 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.02.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 05.05.1993 | GB | 05.05.1993 | IT | 05.05.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | GB | 05.05.1993 | |
IT | 05.05.1993 | ||
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1997/17] | GB | 05.05.1993 | |
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/24] | GB | 05.05.1993 | |
FR | 24.09.1993 | ||
Former [1994/22] | GB | 05.05.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]GB2182812 (MK ELECTRIC LTD); | [XP]EP0209765 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]EP0119187 ; | [X]EP0096601 (MERLIN GERIN [FR]); | [X]DE3338764 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) | [X] - IBM Technical Disclosure Bulletin, Band 25, Nr. 7B, Dezember 1982, Seiten 3641-3642, New York, US, M.J. KELLY et al.: "Self-diagnostic motor overcurrent protection for a printer". |