EP0278247 - Device for holding and handling a syringe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.12.1990 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.01.1991 [1991/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CAMECO MEDICAL LIMITED Chelsea Chambers 262A Fulham Road London SW10 9EL / GB | [1988/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Swallert, Sven Arild 11, rue Michel-Chauvet CH-1208 Genève / CH | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Micheli & Cie SA Rue de Genève 122 Case Postale 61 1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1991/04] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thônex / CH | ||
Former [1988/33] | Micheli & Cie Rue de Genève 122, Case Postale 61 CH-1226 Genève-Thonex / CH | Application number, filing date | 88100423.8 | 14.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | CH19870000511 | 11.02.1987 Original published format: CH 51187 | [1988/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278247 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278247 | Date: | 05.10.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.08.1988 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/315, A61M1/00 | [1988/38] | CPC: |
A61M5/315 (EP,US);
A61M1/67 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/33] | A61M5/315 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Halten und Handhaben einer Spritze | [1988/33] | English: | Device for holding and handling a syringe | [1988/33] | French: | Dispositif de support et de manipulation d'une seringue | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 28.06.1996 | Examination procedure | 30.03.1989 | Examination requested [1989/22] | 01.08.1990 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1991/05] | 29.08.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1991/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2142827 (DEVITEC LTD); | [A]US4594073 (STINE CHARLES R [US]); | [AP]US4711250 (GILBAUGH JR JAMES H [US], et al) |