EP0275924 - Improvements relating to the lining of pipelines and passageways [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.04.1992 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSITUFORM GROUP LIMITED 10 Hill Street Douglas Isle of Man / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states INSITUFORM GROUP LIMITED 10 Hill Street Douglas Isle of Man / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wood, Eric Witch's Mill Arbory Road Castletown Isle of Man / GB | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | Denmark, James Bailey, Walsh & Co. 5 York Place Leeds LS1 2SD Yorkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 88100439.4 | 11.07.1985 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | GB19840018038 | 13.07.1984 Original published format: GB 8418038 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275924 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275924 | Date: | 16.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16L58/10, B29C63/36 | [1988/30] | CPC: |
B29C35/10 (EP,US);
B29C63/0069 (EP,US);
B29C63/36 (EP,US);
F16L55/1651 (EP,US);
H01J61/34 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0833 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1988/30] | Title | German: | Auskleidung von Pipelines und Durchgängen | [1988/30] | English: | Improvements relating to the lining of pipelines and passageways | [1988/30] | French: | Revêtement de tuyaux et conduits | [1988/30] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/45] | 04.02.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/25] | 20.01.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1992/25] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP85108645.4 / EP0168053 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.05.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.07.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.08.1988 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1988 | 28.06.1991 | 07   M02   Fee paid on   12.07.1991 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]BE541559 ; | [A]US4135958 (WOOD ERIC) |