EP0275970 - Positive-working photoresist composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.01.1994 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa 250-0123 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1988/30] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawabe, Yasumasa Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Uenishi, Kazuya Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 03 /
Kokubo, Tadayoshi Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000, Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [1988/30] | Representative(s) | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Barz, Peter, et al Schmied-Kowarzik & Partner Patentanwälte Siegfriedstrasse 8 80803 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/30] | Barz, Peter, Dr., et al Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. G. Dannenberg Dr. P. Weinhold, Dr. D. Gudel Dipl.-Ing. S. Schubert, Dr. P. Barz Siegfriedstrasse 8 D-80803 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100682.9 | 19.01.1988 | [1988/30] | Priority number, date | JP19870010180 | 20.01.1987 Original published format: JP 1018087 | [1988/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0275970 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0275970 | Date: | 19.07.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0275970 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/022 | [1993/12] | CPC: |
G03F7/0226 (EP,US);
G03C1/72 (KR);
G03F7/022 (KR);
G03F7/039 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1988/30] | G03F7/08 | Designated contracting states | DE, NL [1988/30] | Title | German: | Positiv arbeitende Photolack-Zusammensetzung | [1988/30] | English: | Positive-working photoresist composition | [1988/30] | French: | Composition photoréserve positive | [1988/30] | Examination procedure | 29.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 08.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.08.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.08.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]EP0211667 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER CO LTD [JP]); | [E]EP0273026 (ASPECT SYSTEMS CORP [US]) |