EP0278269 - Non-contact sensor with particular utility for measurement of road profile [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Change - representative | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states K.J. Law Engineers, Inc. 23660 Research Drive Farmington Hills Michigan 48024 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states K.J. Law Engineers, Inc. 23660 Research Drive Farmington Hills Michigan 48024 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Walter, Curtis M 73575 S. Fulton Armada, MI 48005 / US | 02 /
Brown, Gordon R 37254 Ladywood Livonia, MI 48154 / US | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Hauck Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Hauck Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schwanthalerstrasse 106 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1988/33] | Dipl.-Ing. H. Hauck, Dipl.-Ing. E. Graalfs, Dipl.-Ing. W. Wehnert, Dr.-Ing. W. Döring Mozartstrasse 23 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100735.5 | 19.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | US19870013960 | 12.02.1987 Original published format: US 13960 | [1988/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278269 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278269 | Date: | 03.04.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01B11/14, G01B11/24 | [1991/19] | CPC: |
G01C7/04 (EP,US);
G01B11/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1988/33] | G01B11/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Nichtkontakt-Messfühler mit besonderem Nutzen zum Messen eines Strassenprofils | [1988/33] | English: | Non-contact sensor with particular utility for measurement of road profile | [1988/33] | French: | Capteur de mesure sans contact, en particulier destiné à mesurer le profil de rues | [1988/33] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/43] | 05.05.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/14] | 05.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1994/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE2617797 (SCHULZ WOLFGANG DIPL PHYS DR I); | [Y]DE3222462 (KE MORANDER AB [SE]); | [A]EP0156991 (JENZER AG FUR MESSTECHNIK [CH]); | [A]EP0183240 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [AD]US4456829 (FOHEY DONALD R [US]) |