EP0277548 - Rotating piston engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.07.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.09.1992 [1992/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states John Deere Technologies International Inc. John Deere Road Moline Illinois 61265 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/14] | For all designated states John Deere Technologies International Inc. John Deere Road Moline Illinois 61265 / US | ||
Former [1988/32] | For all designated states DEERE & COMPANY 1 John Deere Road Moline, Illinois 61265 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jones, Charles 208 Forest Drive Hillsdale New Jersey 07642 / US | [1988/32] | Representative(s) | Feldmann, Bernhard Deere & Company, European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | [1991/14] |
Former [1988/32] | Feldmann, Bernhard DEERE & COMPANY European Office, Patent Department D-68140 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 88100824.7 | 21.01.1988 | [1988/32] | Priority number, date | US19870007877 | 28.01.1987 Original published format: US 7877 | [1988/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0277548 | Date: | 10.08.1988 | Language: | DE | [1988/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0277548 | Date: | 25.09.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | F02B55/10, F01C21/06, F02B55/08 | [1988/32] | CPC: |
F01C21/06 (EP,US);
F02B55/08 (EP,US);
F02B55/10 (EP,US);
F02B1/04 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1988/32] | Title | German: | Drehkolbenmotor | [1988/32] | English: | Rotating piston engine | [1988/32] | French: | Moteur à piston rotatif | [1988/32] | Examination procedure | 18.01.1989 | Examination requested [1989/11] | 26.01.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.04.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.08.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.02.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.03.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 18.03.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP57137602 ; | [X]US4091789 (JONES CHARLES); | [Y]DE2010615 ; | [YD]US4021163 (MORITA YASUYUKI, et al); | [Y]US3923433 (HERMES WALTER LUDWIG, et al); | [A]DE2355651 (TOYO KOGYO CO); | [A]EP0167216 (DEERE JOHN TECHNOLOGIE INT INC [US]); | [A]EP0203480 (DEERE & CO [US]); | [A]EP0120222 (FELDMUEHLE AG [DE]); | [A]DE8212864U ; | [AD]US3949711 (SHOBERT II ERLE I) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 6, Nr. 240 (M-174)[1118], 27. November 1982; & JP-A-57 137 602 (SASAKI) 25.08.1982, & JP57137602 A 00000000 |