EP0278301 - Air flow regulating and noise reducing assembly specifically for hydromassage equipments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 12.06.2002 [2002/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jacuzzi Europe Spa S.S. Pontebbana km 97,2 33098 Valvasone (Pordenone) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | For all designated states Jacuzzi Europe Spa S.S. Pontebbana km 97,2 I-33098 Valvasone (Pordenone) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Soissons, Emanuele Villafranca Via Martiri della Libertà, 10 I-33098 Valvasone (Pordenone) / IT | [1988/33] | Representative(s) | Prüfer, Lutz H. Harthauser Strasse 25d 81545 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/33] | Prüfer, Lutz H., Dipl.-Phys. Harthauser Strasse 25d D-81545 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 88101035.9 | 25.01.1988 | [1988/33] | Priority number, date | IT19870019159 | 26.01.1987 Original published format: IT 1915987 | [1988/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0278301 | Date: | 17.08.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0278301 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0278301 | Date: | 18.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.03.1989 | Classification | IPC: | F16K3/08, A61H9/00 | [1989/17] | CPC: |
A61H33/60 (EP);
F16K47/045 (EP);
F16L55/02 (EP);
A61H2033/022 (EP);
A61H2201/0169 (EP);
A61H33/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1988/33] | F16K3/08 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, LI, SE [1988/33] | Title | German: | Luftregel- und Geräuschmindereinrichtung insbesondere für Wassermassageausrüstungen | [1988/33] | English: | Air flow regulating and noise reducing assembly specifically for hydromassage equipments | [1988/33] | French: | Dispositif de réglage de l'air et d'amortissage des bruits, notamment pour l'équipement d'hydromassage | [1988/33] | Examination procedure | 16.10.1989 | Examination requested [1989/50] | 17.10.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.02.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.10.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 05.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 04.09.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 18.11.1993 | CH | 18.11.1993 | ES | 18.11.1993 | GR | 18.11.1993 | LI | 18.11.1993 | SE | 18.11.1993 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | BE | 18.11.1993 | |
CH | 18.11.1993 | ||
GR | 18.11.1993 | ||
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1997/17] | BE | 18.11.1993 | |
CH | 18.11.1993 | ||
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/48] | BE | 18.11.1993 | |
CH | 18.11.1993 | ||
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/31] | CH | 18.11.1993 | |
LI | 18.11.1993 | ||
SE | 18.11.1993 | ||
Former [1994/28] | SE | 18.11.1993 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB810505 (WALTER WIEDERHOLD); | [A]US2974745 (HELGE KRISTIANSEN SVEND); | [A]DE2439220 (JACUZZI RESEARCH INC); | [A]GB1533073 (TOMOE TECH RES CO); | [A]EP0065266 (NORDISKE KABEL TRAAD [DK]); | [A]DE3142510 (DORNBRACHT FA A [DE]); | [A]US4415003 (PARADIS JOSEPH R [US], et al); | [A]DE3309546 (IDEAL STANDARD [DE]) |